Center City Healthcare, LLC
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:19-bk-11466 |
Case Filed: | Jun 30, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Center City Healthcare, LLC
230 North Broad Street
Philadelphia, PA 19102 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 4:26 PM EDT |
Attorney
Fox Rothschild LLP
919 N. Market Street Suite 300
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Sills Cummis & Gross P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Claims Agent
Omni Management Group, Inc.
www.omnimgt.com 5955 DeSoto Avenue Suite 100
Woodland Hills, CA 91367 |
|
Creditor
224 E. 13th Street Realty Corp.
1201 N. Market Street Suite 800
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Albert Einstein Healthcare Network
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
AmeriHealth HMO, Keystone Health Plan East and QCC Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Association of American Medical Colleges
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Atlantic City Energy Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Beckman Coulter, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Benefit Fund for Hospital and Health Care Employees, Philadelphia and Vicinity
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BioCare, Inc., an Arizona for-profit corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bradford Capital Management, LLC
|
|
Creditor
Crystal Broomer
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CRG Financial LLC
84 Herbert Avenue Building B Suite 202
Closter, NJ 07624 |
|
Creditor
CS Medical
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Leslie Caldwell
5307 Limestone Road Suite 103
Wilmington, DE 19808 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Johnathan Carroll
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cerner Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Philadelphia
Philadelphia, PA 19102
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kelly Ann Cody
Self Inc. Womans Shelter 1305 W. Susquehanna Ave.
Philadelphia, PA 19122 |
|
Creditor
Coloplast Corp.
1601 West River Road North
Minneapolis, MN 55411 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Conifer Revenue Cycle Solutions, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Constellation New Energy - Gas Division, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Crothall Healthcare, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
DaVita, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thomas F. Dooner
1106 Solly Avenue
Philadelphia, PA 19111 |
|
Creditor
Drexel University
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Educational Commission for Foreign Medical Graduates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ensemble RCM, LLC d/b/a Ensemble Health Partners
Jones Walker LLP P. O. Box 427
Jackson, MS 39205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Former Physician Group
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
General Healthcare Resources, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gift of Life Donor Program, Greater Delaware Valley Society
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Global Neurosciences Institute, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hayes Locum, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Herman Goldner Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Charles Huff
Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP 824 N. Market Street Suite 800
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Keystone Quality Transport, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
LEAF Capital Funding LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings
CT Corporation Systems 225 Hillsborough Street
Raleigh, NC 27603 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mayflower Laundry and Textile Services, LLC
2601 West Lexington Street
Baltimore, MD 21223 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
McKesson Plasma & Biologics, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Med One Capital Funding, LLC
36 South State Street 14th Floor ATTN: David H. Leigh
Salt Lake City, UT 84111 |
|
Creditor
Medline Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
MidCap Funding H Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
MidCap Funding IV Trust (formally known as MidCap Funding IV, LLC)
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young 2005 Market Street Suite 2600
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Monogram Biosciences, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
NG 1500 Market St. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
NTT Data Services
1801 S. MoPac Expressway Suite 320 Suite 320
Austin, TX 78746 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Frank Napolitano
Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP 824 N. Market Street Suite 800
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
John Thanh Nguyen
1201 North Orange St., Suite 301
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
PATHS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
PECO Energy Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
PHILADELPHIA GAS WORKS
800 W. Montgomery Avenue
Philadelphia, PA 19122 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pennsylvania Association of Staff Nurses and Allied Professionals
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pennsylvania Department of Revenue
Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP 824 N. Market Street Suite 800
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
August Peraino
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pfizer Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Philadelphia College of Osteopathic Medicine
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Philadelphia Hospital and Healthcare Employees - District 1199C Training and Upgrading Fund
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Philadelphia Hospital and Healthcare Employees- District 1199C Training and Upgrading Fund
1601 Market Street, Suite 1500
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Premier, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Renal Treatment Centers-Northeast, Inc.
1551 Wewatta
Denver, CO 80202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Liliana E. Rivera
1201 North Orange St., Suite 301
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Roche Diagnostics Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rydal Square, L.P.
Kurtzman | Steady, LLC 401 S. 2nd Street, Suite 200
Philadelphia, PA 19147 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pamela Saechow
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Shades of Green, Inc.
1777 South Pennsylvania Avenue
Morrisville, PA 19067 |
|
Creditor
Shawanda Smith and Chamarr Fanning, Individually and as Parents and Natural Guardians of N.F., a minor
Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP 824 N. Market Street Suite 800
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Corinthia Shields
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sodexo Management, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sodexo, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
SpecialtyCare IOM Services, LLC
White and Williams LLP 600 N. King Street, Suite 800
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
SpecialtyCare, Inc.
White and Williams LLP 600 N. King Street, Suite 800
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
St. Agnes MOB, LLC
Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP 824 N. Market Street Suite 800
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Suzanne Richards & Pamela Saechow
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tenet Business Services Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Advisory Board Company
One Constitution Plaza
Hartford, CT 06013 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Chubb Companies
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Marc A. AI ThermaSolutions
Stoel Rives LLP C/O Marc A. AI 33 South 6th Street Suite 4200
Minneapolis, MN 55402 |
|
Creditor
ThyssenKrupp Elevator Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Trustees of the Pension Fund for Hospital and Health Care Employees Philadelphia and Vicinity
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Urology for Children, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Veolia Energy Philadelphia, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vicinity Energy Philadelphia, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vitalant, an Arizona non-profit corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vizient, Inc.
5420 LBJ Freeway, Suite 1900
Dallas, TX 75240 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Fox Rothschild LLP Attn: Thomas M. Horan 919 N. Market Street Suite 300
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Health Care Ombudsman
Suzanne Koenig
|
|
Health Care Ombudsman
Suzanne Koenig, as Patient Care Ombudsman
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Abbott Laboratories Inc.
4650 North Port Washington Rd Second Floor
Milwaukee, WI 53212 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Accreditation Council for Graduate Medical Education
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Committee of Hahnemann Residents and Fellows
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
American Academic Health Systems, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Amicus Curiae
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Attorneys for The Advisory Board Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
William C. Boyer
|
|
Interested Party
Broad Street Healthcare Properties II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Broad Street Healthcare Properties III, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Broad Street Healthcare Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Frank T Brzozowski
Frank Brzozowski 2357 E Dauphin Street
Philadelphia, PA 19125 |
|
Interested Party
Cadence Bank, N.A.
500 Delaware Avenue 8th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Call 4 Health, Inc.
2855 S. Congress Ave. Suite AB
Delray Beach, FL 33445 |
|
Interested Party
Call 4 Nurse LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Capital One, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Certain Physicians Under the Philadelphia Academic Health System Physician Practice Plan
Attn: David W. Carickhoff, Esq. 300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1100
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Department of Health
Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP 824 N. Market Street, Suite 800
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Department of Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Office of Attorney General
1600 Arch Street Suite 300
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Cooper University Healthcare
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jeffrey Cutler
PO Box 2806
York, PA 17405 |
|
Interested Party
DaVita, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
District 1199C National Union of Health Care Employees, AFSCME
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Joel Freedman
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Front Street Healthcare Properties II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Front Street Healthcare Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Future IT Advisors
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Gordon Brothers Realty Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Sanjay K. Gupta
|
|
Interested Party
HSRE-PAHH I, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
HSREP VI Holding, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Hackensack Meridian Health
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Thomas Hall
|
|
Interested Party
Harrison Street Real Estate, LLC and its affiliates
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
IS 245 NORTH 15TH LLC
IS 245 NORTH 15TH LLC 2929 Walnut Street Suite 1540
Philadelphia, PA 19104 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
IS BBFB LLC
IS BBFB LLC 2929 Walnut Street Suite 1540
Philadelphia, PA 19104 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Robert Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
KPC Global
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
James S Kennedy
|
|
Interested Party
Carol Kerr
|
|
Interested Party
Manoj Khandelwal
|
|
Interested Party
Ulyana Kulish
|
|
Interested Party
Tremayne S. Lewis
2705 W Silver Street
Philadelphia, PA 19132 |
|
Interested Party
MBNF Investments, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
MBNF Non-Debtor Entities
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
MCKESSON CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Christopher Mahrovs, M.D.
|
|
Interested Party
Achintya Moulick
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Brendan Mullen
|
|
Interested Party
Non-Debtor PAHH Entities
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Omni Management Group, Inc.
www.omnimgt.com 5955 DeSoto Avenue Suite 100
Woodland Hills, CA 91367 |
|
Interested Party
PAHH Bellet MOB, LLC;
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
PAHH Broad Street MOB, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
PAHH Erie Street Garage, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
PAHH Feinstein MOB, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
PAHH New College MOB, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
PAHH Wood Street Garage, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Paladin Healthcare Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Peoples Capital and Leasing Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Philadelphia Academic Health Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Philadelphia Academic Risk Retention Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Philadelphia Urosurgical Associates, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
LINDA RAMSEY
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Renal Treatment Centers-Northeast, Inc.
1551 Wewatta
Denver, CO 80202 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
SBJ Group Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Elise Singer
|
|
Interested Party
Sukhdeep Singh
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Edward Sockol
|
|
Interested Party
St. Christopher's Hospital for Children Medical Staff
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Strategic Global Management, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
TOWER HEALTH SERVICES
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Temple University Health System, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Temple University Health System, Inc. and Temple University Hospital, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Thomas Jefferson University
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Thomas Jefferson University Hospitals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
University of Pennsylvania Health System
|
|
Interested Party
Watts Restoration Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Shawn Williams
909 W. Penn Pines Blvd.
Aldan, PA 19018 |
|
Interested Party
Health Partners Plans, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Berkeley Research Group, LLC
|
|
Spec. Counsel
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
919 Market Street Suite 1000
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Creditor
MidCap Financial Trust
Terminated: 07/01/2019
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
MidCap Funding Financial Trust
Terminated: 07/05/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago |
Wednesday, May 14, 2025 | ||
5780 | 5780
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Debtors Motion for Entry of (I) an Order (A) Scheduling a Hearing to Consider Approval of the Sale of Certain Real Estate, (B) Approving Bidding Procedures and the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof, (C) Approving Bid Protections and (D) Granting Related Relief; and (II) an Order (A) Approving the Sale of Certain Real Estate, Free and Clear of Certain Liens, Claims and Encumbrances, and (B) Granting Related Relief [Docket No. 5765] . Filed by Omni Management Group, Inc.. (Lowry, Randy) |
|
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
5779 | 5779
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Motion of Debtors for Entry of Order (I) Authorizing Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC to Make Supplemental Secured Loan to Support Broad Street Real Estate Pursuant to Memorandum of Understanding and 11 U.S.C. §§ 363, 364 and 105(a) and (II) Granting Related Relief [Docket No. 5767] . Filed by Omni Management Group, Inc.. (Lowry, Randy) |
|
5778 | 5778
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Sixty-Seventh Monthly Fee Application of Saul Ewing LLP, Counsel to the Debtors, for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from January 1, 2025 Through January 31, 2025 [Docket No. 5761] . Filed by Omni Management Group, Inc.. (Lowry, Randy) |
|
Friday, May 09, 2025 | ||
5777 | 5777
![]() Certificate of No Objection Regarding Interim Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (20th) as Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period April 1, 2024 to June 30, 2024 Filed by Fox Rothschild LLP. (Niederman, Seth) |
|
5776 | 5776
![]() Certificate of No Objection Regarding Interim Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (19th) as Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period January 1, 2024 to March 31, 2024 Filed by Fox Rothschild LLP. (Niederman, Seth) |
|
5775 | 5775
![]() Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings. Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 6/23/2025 at 02:00 PM US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 7/31/2025 at 10:30 AM US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 8/28/2025 at 10:30 AM US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Signed on 5/9/2025. (LMC) |
|
5774 | 5774
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Hearing Dates (June, July and August, 2025) Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. (DiSabatino, Monique) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
5773 | 5773
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Eighteenth Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Further Extending the Time Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions [Docket No. 5760] . Filed by Omni Management Group, Inc.. (Lowry, Randy) |
|
5772 | 5772
![]() Certificate of No Objection re: Quarterly Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (20th) for the period April 1, 2024 to June 30, 2024 Filed by Sills Cummis & Gross P.C. Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Niederman, Seth) |
|
5771 | 5771
![]() Certificate of No Objection re: Quarterly Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (19th) for the period January 1, 2024 to March 31, 2024 Filed by Sills Cummis & Gross P.C. Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Niederman, Seth) |
|
5770 | 5770
![]() Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required re: Monthly Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (60th) for the period June 1, 2024 to June 30, 2024 Filed by Sills Cummis & Gross P.C. Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Niederman, Seth) |
|
5769 | 5769
![]() Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required re: Monthly Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (59th) for the period May 1, 2024 to May 31, 2024 Filed by Sills Cummis & Gross P.C. Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Niederman, Seth) |
|
5768 | 5768
![]() Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Re: Monthly Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (58th) for the period April 1, 2024 to April 30, 2024 Filed by Sills Cummis & Gross P.C. Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Niederman, Seth) |
|
Wednesday, May 07, 2025 | ||
5767 | 5767
![]() Motion to Authorize Philadelphia Academic Health System, LLC to Make Supplemental Secured Loan to Support Broad Street Real Estate Pursuant to Memorandum of Understanding and 11 U.S.C. §§ 363, 364 and 105(a) and Granting Related Relief Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/28/2025 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/21/2025. (Minuti, Mark) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
5766 | 5766
crditcrd
none
Wed 05/07 3:48 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens([LINK 19-11466 MFW] ) [motion,msell] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A12165114, amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
5765 | 5765
![]() Motion For Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens(FEE) Debtors' Motion for Entry of (I) an Order (A) Scheduling a Hearing to Consider Approval of the Sale of Certain Real Estate, (B) Approving Bidding Procedures and the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof, (C) Approving Bid Protections, and (D) Granting Related Relief; and (II) an Order (A) Approving the Sale of Certain Real Estate, Free and Clear of Certain Liens, Claims and Encumbrances, and (B) Granting Related Relief Fee Amount $199 Filed by Center City Healthcare, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/28/2025 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/21/2025. (DiSabatino, Monique) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |