Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-11466

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:19-bk-11475
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
TPS of PA, L.L.C.
230 N Broad St
Philadelphia, PA 19102-1121
Represented By
Mark Minuti
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
6 6 court Case Reassigned Wed 03/04 11:36 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin Gross Terminated (SH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 08/14 1:02 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by TPS of PA, L.L.C.. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 08/14 1:01 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by TPS of PA, L.L.C.. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 07/02 3:43 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An Order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Center City Healthcare, LLC d/b/a Hahnemann University Hospital, Case No. 19-11466 (KG) for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 19-11466 (KG) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 7/2/2019 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2019
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 07/01 8:39 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-11475 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9364554, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 07/01 12:36 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by TPS of PA, L.L.C.. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 07/31/2019 (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 07/01 7:44 AM
Judge Kevin Gross added to case (LB)
Related: [-]