Smith v. BACKE COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 9:17-bk-18864
Lead BK case is: 9:17-bk-18864
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mindy A Mora |
Case #: | 9:19-ap-01219 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 19, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
BACKE COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaret J Smith
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 03/19 3:11 PM
Adversary Case 9:19-ap-1219 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Romaguera-Serfaty, Maria) |
|
Friday, February 14, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 02/15 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 02/14/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Wed 02/12 2:46 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (Adam, Lorraine) |
|
Thursday, October 17, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 10/18 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 10/17/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, October 16, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 10/16 9:55 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Margaret J Smith . (Wirth, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Continue Hearing Order
Tue 10/15 7:59 PM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Pre-Trial Conference On: (1 Complaint). Pretrial Conference set for 02/11/2020 at 10:00 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Romaguera-Serfaty, Maria) |
|
Monday, October 14, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Continue Hearing
Mon 10/14 4:48 PM
Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued,3 Order Setting Requirements,5 Order Continuing Hearing)] Pretrial Conference and Related Pretrial Deadlines Filed by Plaintiff Margaret J Smith (Wirth, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 18, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
court
Notification of Returned Mail
Wed 09/18 2:53 PM
Notification of Returned Mail. A document mailed to the party indicated on the attached notice, has been returned to the bankruptcy court due to the inability of the U.S. Postal Service to deliver it as addressed. (Ortman, Martha) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 09/13 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 09/12/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 09/12 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 09/11/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
Notice of PDF Document to BNC
Tue 09/10 4:07 PM
Notice of Transmittal of PDF Document to BNC for Noticing (Perusso, Conce) |
|
6 | 6
court
Notification of Returned Mail
Tue 09/10 3:38 PM
Notification of Returned Mail. A document mailed to the party indicated on the attached notice, has been returned to the bankruptcy court due to the inability of the U.S. Postal Service to deliver it as addressed. (Cradic, Cameron) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order Continuing Hearing
Mon 09/09 1:43 PM
Order Rescheduling Pretrial Conference . Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Perusso, Conce) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Fri 08/30 1:52 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney David B Marks . (Marks, David) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
5
pgs
order
Order Setting Requirements (Adv)
Mon 07/15 12:32 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 28 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Fleurimond, Lucie) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Mon 07/15 12:31 PM
Summons Issued on Backe Communications, Inc. Answer Due 8/14/2019 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Fleurimond, Lucie) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/12 12:32 PM
Adversary case 19-01219 Complaint by Margaret J Smith against BACKE COMMUNICATIONS, INC.. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Marks, David) |