Smith v. Piege Company, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 9:17-bk-18864
Lead BK case is: 9:17-bk-18864
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mindy A Mora |
Case #: | 9:19-ap-01220 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 18, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Piege Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaret J Smith
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 12/18 3:06 PM
Adversary Case 9:19-ap-1220 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Romaguera-Serfaty, Maria) |
|
Monday, October 14, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Dismissal [Adversary]
Mon 10/14 3:56 PM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Margaret J Smith. (Wirth, Steven) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 09/13 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 09/12/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 09/12 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 09/11/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
Notice of PDF Document to BNC
Tue 09/10 4:11 PM
Notice of Transmittal of PDF Document to BNC for Noticing (Perusso, Conce) |
|
6 | 6
court
Notification of Returned Mail
Tue 09/10 3:41 PM
Notification of Returned Mail. A document mailed to the party indicated on the attached notice, has been returned to the bankruptcy court due to the inability of the U.S. Postal Service to deliver it as addressed. (Cradic, Cameron) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order Continuing Hearing
Mon 09/09 1:55 PM
Order Rescheduling Pretrial Conference . Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Perusso, Conce) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Fri 08/30 1:50 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney David B Marks . (Marks, David) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
5
pgs
order
Order Setting Requirements (Adv)
Mon 07/15 12:43 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 28 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Fleurimond, Lucie) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Mon 07/15 12:42 PM
Summons Issued on Piege Company, Inc. Answer Due 8/14/2019 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Fleurimond, Lucie) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/12 12:40 PM
Adversary case 19-01220 Complaint by Margaret J Smith against Piege Company, Inc.. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Marks, David) |