Marshack v. Integrity Healthcare Locums, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-13077
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-13077
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Theodor Albert |
Case #: | 8:19-ap-01140 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Integrity Healthcare Locums, LLC, a Florida limited liability company
200 S. Biscayne Blvd. Suite 3600
Miami, FL 33131 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee
870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM PDT |
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/06 2:54 PM
Adversary Case 8:19-ap-1140 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Steinberg, Elizabeth) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Thu 03/05 3:05 PM
Hearing Held - OFF CALENDAR; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF AN ADVERSARY PROCEEDING THAT DOES NOT INVOLVE CLAIMS UNDER 11 U.S.C. SECTION 727 FILED 3/2/2020 (Steinberg, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice
Mon 03/02 11:49 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding that Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 U.S.C. § 727 [FRBP 7041(A)] Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack. (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Fri 12/06 11:05 AM
Hearing Continued CONTINUED Status hearing to be held on 3/5/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Steinberg, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Status report
Mon 11/25 5:06 PM
Status report Unilateral Filed by Trustee Richard A Marshack (TR) . (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 10/04 3:01 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Continued Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack. (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Thursday, September 26, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Fri 09/27 3:22 PM
Hearing Continued CONTINUED Status hearing to be held on 12/5/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Steinberg, Elizabeth) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Status report
Thu 09/19 2:07 PM
Status report - Unilateral Filed by Trustee Richard A Marshack (TR) . (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Sunday, September 15, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sun 09/15 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/15/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
order
Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Fri 09/13 3:15 PM
Order Approving Stipulation To Vacate Entry Of Default (BNC-PDF) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED. THE ENTRY OF DEFAULT IS VACATED AND DEFENDANT SHALL ANSWER THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 11, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT SHALL NOT CONTEST THE VALIDITY OF SERVICE OF THE COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS, AND SHALL NOT MOVE TO DISMISS THE PRESENT MATTER ON THE BASIS OF IMPROPER SERVICE OF PROCESS. Signed on 9/13/2019 (Deramus, Glenda) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Fri 09/13 9:56 AM
Stipulation By Richard A Marshack (TR) and Defendant to Vacate Entry of Default Filed by Trustee Richard A Marshack (TR) (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Thu 09/12 11:54 AM
Stipulation By Richard A Marshack (TR) and Defendant to Vacate Entry of Default Filed by Trustee Richard A Marshack (TR) (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 08/28 9:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/28/2019. (Admin.) |
|
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 08/28 9:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/28/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC)
Mon 08/26 4:11 PM
Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default Against Defendant(s) Integrity Healthcare Locums, LLC, a Florida limited liability company (Daniels, Sally) |
|
19 | 19
court
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required
Mon 08/26 3:45 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Other - Request filed in this case in error. Attorney has re-filed the Request in the correct adversary case 8 19-01137 TA THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (Daniels, Sally) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1)
Mon 08/26 2:36 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Integrity Healthcare Locums, Inc., a Florida limited liability company Filed by Trustee Richard A Marshack (TR). (Djang, Caroline) Warning: See docket entry no: 19 for corrective action. Modified on 8/26/2019 (Daniels, Sally) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Declaration
Mon 08/26 2:35 PM
Declaration re: Request for Clerk to Enter Default Filed by Trustee Richard A Marshack (TR). (Djang, Caroline) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1)
Mon 08/26 2:30 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Integrity Healthcare Locums, Inc., a Florida limited liability company Filed by Trustee Richard A Marshack (TR). (Djang, Caroline) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk (BNC)
Mon 08/26 1:03 PM
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk Against Defendant(s) Integrity Healthcare Locums, LLC, a Florida limited liability company (Daniels, Sally) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 08/21 9:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/21/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Declaration
Mon 08/19 3:50 PM
Declaration re: Request for Clerk to Enter Default Filed by Trustee Richard A Marshack (TR) . (Djang, Caroline) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1)
Mon 08/19 3:48 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Integrity Healthcare Locums, LLC, a Florida limited liability company Filed by Trustee Richard A Marshack (TR). (Djang, Caroline) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk (BNC)
Mon 08/19 12:44 PM
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk Against Defendant(s) Integrity Healthcare Locums, LLC, a Florida limited liability company (Steinberg, Elizabeth) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Declaration
Mon 08/19 10:00 AM
Declaration re: Request for Clerk to Enter Default Filed by Trustee Richard A Marshack (TR). (Djang, Caroline) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1)
Mon 08/19 9:59 AM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Integrity Healthcare Locums, LLC, a Florida limited liability company Filed by Trustee Richard A Marshack (TR). (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Sunday, August 18, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sun 08/18 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/18/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk (BNC)
Fri 08/16 5:19 PM
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk Against Defendant(s) Integrity Healthcare Locums, LLC (Daniels, Sally) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Declaration
Fri 08/16 2:40 PM
Declaration re: Request for Clerk to Enter Default Filed by Trustee Richard A Marshack (TR) . (Djang, Caroline) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1)
Fri 08/16 2:38 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Integrity Healthcare Locums, LLC, a Florida limited liability company Filed by Trustee Richard A Marshack (TR). (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 07/17 2:57 PM
Summons Service Executed on Integrity Healthcare Locums, LLC 7/15/2019 (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
court
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required
Mon 07/15 10:33 AM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect case data/statistical information was entered at the time of filing. Incorrect demand amount entered. Corrected from 21372000 to 21000 THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Incorrect plaintiff/defendant/attorney/party information was entered at the time of filing. Incorrect plaintiff name entered. Corrected to reflect the PDF THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Other - Additional Nature of Suit 14 - Recovery of money/property - other was not selected. The court has corrected this THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (Daniels, Sally) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Fri 07/12 4:36 PM
Summons Issued on Integrity Healthcare Locums, LLC Date Issued 7/12/2019, Answer Due 8/12/2019 Status hearing to be held on 9/26/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Daniels, Sally) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/11 3:31 PM
Adversary case 8:19-ap-01140. Complaint by Richard Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee against Integrity Healthcare Locums, LLC. (Charge To Estate). Complaint To Avoid and Recover Preferential Transer(s) Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |