Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee v. Integrity Healthcare Locums, LL.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-13077
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-13077
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Theodor Albert |
Case #: | 8:19-ap-01145 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 09, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Integrity Healthcare Locums, LL.
200 S. Biscayne Blvd. Suite 3600
Miami, FL 33131 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM PDT |
Monday, March 09, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 03/09 5:59 PM
Adversary Case 8:19-ap-1145 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Steinberg, Elizabeth) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Thu 03/05 3:33 PM
Hearing Held - Off Calendar; Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 Filed 3/2/2020 (Daniels, Sally) |
|
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice
Mon 03/02 1:24 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding that Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 U.S.C. § 727 [FRBP 7041(A)] Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Fri 12/06 11:08 AM
Hearing Continued CONTINUED Status hearing to be held on 3/5/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Steinberg, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status report
Mon 11/25 5:27 PM
Status report Unilateral Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee . (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 10/04 3:06 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Continued Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Fri 10/04 2:52 PM
Hearing Continued CONTINUED Status hearing to be held on 12/5/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Steinberg, Elizabeth) |
|
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Thu 10/03 4:47 PM
Hearing (Adv Other) Continued Status Hearing to be held on 12/05/2019 at 10:00 AM Ronald Reagan Federal Bldg 411 W Fourth St Crtrm 5B Santa Ana, CA 92701 for1 , (Deramus, Glenda) |
||
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status report
Thu 09/19 2:08 PM
Status report - Unilateral Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee . (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Sunday, September 15, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sun 09/15 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/15/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF)
Thu 09/12 6:46 PM
Order Vacating Entry Of Default (BNC-PDF) (Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default Against Defendant(s) Integrity Healthcare Locums, LLC, a Florida limited liability company entered on 8/26/2019 (Related Doc #7 ) Signed on 9/12/2019 (Steinberg, Elizabeth) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Thu 09/12 11:55 AM
Stipulation By Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee and Defendant to Vacate Entry of Default Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 08/28 9:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/28/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC)
Mon 08/26 4:47 PM
Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default Against Defendant(s) Integrity Healthcare Locums, LLC, a Florida limited liability company (Daniels, Sally) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Declaration
Mon 08/26 2:46 PM
Declaration re: Request for Clerk to Enter Default Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee . (Djang, Caroline) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1)
Mon 08/26 2:45 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Integrity Healthcare Locums, Inc., a Florida limited liability company Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 07/17 3:01 PM
Summons Service Executed on Integrity Healthcare Locums, LL. 7/15/2019 (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Mon 07/15 11:28 AM
Summons Issued on Integrity Healthcare Locums, LL. Date Issued 7/15/2019, Answer Due 8/14/2019 Status hearing to be held on 10/3/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Daniels, Sally) |
|
2 | 2
court
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required
Mon 07/15 11:12 AM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Other - Additional Nature of Suit not entered: 14 - Recovery of money/property - other. The court has corrected this. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (Daniels, Sally) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/11 4:24 PM
Adversary case 8:19-ap-01145. Complaint by Richard A. Marshack (TR) against Integrity Healthcare Locums, LLC, a Florida limited liability company. (Charge To Estate). Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfer(s) Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |