Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee v. Radiant Physician Group, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-13077
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-13077
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Theodor Albert |
Case #: | 8:19-ap-01147 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 03, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Radiant Physician Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM PDT |
Thursday, February 03, 2022 | ||
41 | 41
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 02/03 1:22 PM
Adversary Case 8:19-ap-1147 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Mccall, Audrey) |
|
Thursday, February 25, 2021 | ||
40 | 40
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Thu 02/25 3:11 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Hearing Held - Off Calendar - Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Entered 2-16-21 (Deramus, Glenda) |
|
Thursday, February 18, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Thu 02/18 9:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/18/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2021 | ||
38 | 38
order
Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Tue 02/16 3:47 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice (BNC-PDF) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED That This Adversary Proceeding Is DIsmissed. Signed on 2/16/2021 (Deramus, Glenda) |
|
37 | 37
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Tue 02/16 12:02 PM
Stipulation By Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee and Defendant for Order Dismissing Adv Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Notice of Lodgment
Thu 09/24 7:53 PM
Notice of lodgment of Status Conference and Scheduling Order Pursuant to LBR 7016-1(a)(4) Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee . (Djang, Caroline) |
|
35 | 35
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Thu 09/24 3:04 PM
Status Conference Hearing Held - Pre-Trial Conference Set Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Deadline For Completing Discovery: January 31, 2021; Last Date For Filing Pre-Trial Motions: February 12, 2021; Pre-Trial Conference On: February 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M.; Joint Pre-Trial Order Due Per Local Rules; Refer To Mediation. Order Appointing Mediator To Be Lodged By Plaintiff Within 10 Days. One Day Of Mediation To Be Completed By January 2, 2021 (Deramus, Glenda) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Status report
Thu 09/10 5:54 PM
Status report (Joint) Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee . (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Thursday, July 23, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Fri 07/24 11:28 AM
Hearing Continued Re: Status Conference Status hearing to be held on 9/24/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert -PER ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE ENTERED 7-08-20 (Deramus, Glenda) |
|
Friday, July 10, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Fri 07/10 9:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/10/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 08, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Wed 07/08 5:03 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference Re: (BNC-PDF) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED. THE STATUS CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET FOR JULY 23, 2020 AT 10:00 A.M. Signed on 7/8/2020 (Deramus, Glenda) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Wed 07/08 3:44 PM
Stipulation By Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee and Radiant Physician Group, Inc. Continuing Initial Status Conference (Fifth Stipulation) Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Wed 05/06 4:44 PM
Hearing Held (Bk Other) - CONTINUED TO 7-23-20 AT 10:00 A.M. PER ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING ENTERED 5-01-20 (Deramus, Glenda) |
|
Sunday, May 03, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sun 05/03 9:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/03/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 01, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
order
Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Fri 05/01 4:58 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Continuing Status Conferfence (BNC-PDF) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED. THE STATUS CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET FOR MAY 6, 2020 AT 10:00 A.M. TO JULY 23, 2020 AT 10:00 A.M. OR TO ANOTHER DATE THAT MAY BE CONFENIENT TO THE COURT Signed on 5/1/2020 (Deramus, Glenda) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Fri 05/01 11:34 AM
Stipulation By Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee and Radiant Physician Group, Inc. Continuing Initial Status Conference (Fourth Stipulation) Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Thursday, April 30, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Thu 04/30 3:33 PM
Stipulation By Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee and Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee (Djang, Caroline) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Thu 04/30 9:29 AM
Stipulation By Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee and Radiant Physician Group, Inc. Continuing Initial Status Conference (Fourth Stipulation) Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Wed 04/29 4:10 PM
Stipulation By Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee and Radiant Physician Group, Inc. Continuing Initial Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Friday, April 17, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/17 11:53 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Radiant Physician Group, Inc.. (Golden, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, April 14, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice
Tue 04/14 2:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee . (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Friday, April 10, 2020 | ||
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Fri 04/10 12:14 PM
Hearing (Adv Other) Continued Status Hearing to be held on 05/06/2020 at 10:00 AM Ronald Reagan Federal Bldg 411 W Fourth St Crtrm 5B Santa Ana, CA 92701 for1 , (Steinberg, Elizabeth) |
||
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Thu 03/05 9:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/05/2020. (Admin.) |
|
19 | 19
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Thu 03/05 3:39 PM
Hearing Continued - Continued to May 7, 2020 at 11:00 am Per Order Continuing Status Conference Entered 3/3/2020. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Daniels, Sally) |
|
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
order
Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Tue 03/03 3:48 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference Currently Set for March 5, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. to May 7 2020 at 11:00 a.m. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/3/2020 (Steinberg, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Mon 03/02 4:51 PM
Stipulation By Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee and Radiant Physician Group, Inc. Continuing Initial Status Conference (Third Stipulation) Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Fri 12/13 9:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/13/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Thu 12/12 5:58 PM
Status Conference Re: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Preferential Transfer(s) Pursuant To 11 USC Section 547 And 550 - Hearing Continued Status hearing to be held on 3/5/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - CONTINUED TO 3-5-20 AT 10:00 A.M. PER ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE ENTERED 12-11-19 (Deramus, Glenda) |
|
Wednesday, December 11, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Wed 12/11 10:19 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference Re: Amended Stipulation (BNC-PDF) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED. THE STATUS CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET FOR DECEMBER 12, 2019 AT 10:00 A.M. BE CONTINUED TO MARCH 5, 2020 AT 10:00 A.M. OR TO ANOTHER DATE THAT MAY BE CONVENIENT TO THE COURT. Signed on 12/11/2019 (Deramus, Glenda) |
|
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Tue 12/10 4:02 PM
AMENDED Stipulation Between Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee, and Radiant Physician Group, Inc Continuing Status Conference; Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee (Daniels, Sally) |
|
12 | 12
court
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Tue 12/10 12:30 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. The PDF does not contain any signatures THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT PDF IMMEDIATELY. (Daniels, Sally) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Tue 12/10 10:17 AM
Stipulation By Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee and Radiant Physician Group, Inc. Continuing Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee (Djang, Caroline) Warning: See docket entry no: 12 for corrective action. Modified on 12/10/2019 (Daniels, Sally) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Mon 12/09 3:47 PM
Stipulation By Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee and Radiant Physician Group, Inc. Continuing Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Thu 10/03 5:56 PM
Hearing Continued Status hearing to be held on 12/12/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - CONTINUED TO 12-12-19 AT 10:00 A.M. PER ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE, RESPONSE DEADLINE AND RELATED DEADLINES ENTERED 9-23-19 (Deramus, Glenda) |
|
Wednesday, September 25, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Wed 09/25 9:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF)
Mon 09/23 11:49 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference, Response Deadlines And Related Deadlines (BNC-PDF) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET FOR OCTOBER 3, 2019 AT 10:00 A.M. IS CONTINUED TO DECEMBER 12, 2019 AT 10:00 A.M. - PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER RULING Signed on 9/23/2019 (Deramus, Glenda) |
|
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Fri 09/20 11:40 AM
Stipulation By Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee and Defendant Continuing Status Conference, Response Deadline and Related Deadlines Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Status report
Thu 09/19 3:07 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Richard A Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee . (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 07/17 3:03 PM
Summons Service Executed on Radiant Physician Group, Inc. 7/15/2019 (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Mon 07/15 11:33 AM
Summons Issued on Radiant Physician Group, Inc. Date Issued 7/15/2019, Answer Due 8/14/2019 Status hearing to be held on 10/3/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Daniels, Sally) |
|
2 | 2
court
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required
Mon 07/15 11:21 AM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Other - Additional Nature of Suit not selected: 14 - Recovery of money/property - other. The court has corrected this. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (Daniels, Sally) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/11 4:30 PM
Adversary case 8:19-ap-01147. Complaint by Richard A. Marshack (TR) against Radiant Physician Group, Inc., a California corporation. (Charge To Estate). Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfer(s) Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Djang, Caroline) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |