Smith v. Disney Consumer Products, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 9:17-bk-18864
Lead BK case is: 9:17-bk-18864
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mindy A Mora |
Case #: | 9:19-ap-01222 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 19, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Disney Consumer Products, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaret J Smith
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 63 minutes ago |
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/19 4:18 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Margaret J Smith . (Wirth, Steven) |
|
16 | 16
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 03/19 3:15 PM
Adversary Case 9:19-ap-1222 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Romaguera-Serfaty, Maria) |
|
15 | 15
ordertext
Order Dismissing Adversary Case as Settled (TEXT ONLY) [DO NOT USE]
Thu 03/19 3:14 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding as Settled. ***The parties in this adversary proceeding have reached a settlement. The settlement agreement was filed in the main bankruptcy case, and the Court has entered an order in the main case approving the settlement agreement. Therefore, this adversary proceeding is DISMISSED AS SETTLED. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the settlement. This dismissal does not affect the validity or enforceability of any judgment entered before or after entry of this Order.. Movant is directed to serve copies of this text-only order upon required parties and file a certificate of service with the court pursuant to Local Rule 2002-1(F). SO ORDERED by Judge Mindy A Mora . (**This is a text-only order with no underlying PDF image entered pursuant to Local Rule 5005-4(F) and Local Rule 9021-1(A)**). (Romaguera-Serfaty, Maria) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Filing
Tue 02/25 3:48 PM
Notice of Filing Settlement Agreement , Filed by Plaintiff Margaret J Smith.(Wirth, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Trustee's Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement with Defendant Disney Consumer Products, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 | ||
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 10/21 9:02 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 10/18/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, October 16, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 10/16 9:25 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Margaret J Smith . (Wirth, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Continue Hearing Order
Tue 10/15 8:03 PM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Pre-Trial Conference On: (1 Complaint). Pretrial Conference set for 02/11/2020 at 10:00 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Romaguera-Serfaty, Maria) |
|
Monday, October 14, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Continue Hearing
Mon 10/14 4:53 PM
Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued,3 Order Setting Requirements,5 Order Continuing Hearing)] Pretrial Conference and Related Pretrial Deadlines Filed by Plaintiff Margaret J Smith (Wirth, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 09/13 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 09/12/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 09/12 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 09/11/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
Notice of PDF Document to BNC
Tue 09/10 4:04 PM
Notice of Transmittal of PDF Document to BNC for Noticing (Perusso, Conce) |
|
6 | 6
court
Notification of Returned Mail
Tue 09/10 3:35 PM
Notification of Returned Mail. A document mailed to the party indicated on the attached notice, has been returned to the bankruptcy court due to the inability of the U.S. Postal Service to deliver it as addressed. (Cradic, Cameron) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order Continuing Hearing
Mon 09/09 1:45 PM
Order Rescheduling Pretrial Conference . Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Perusso, Conce) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Fri 08/30 1:53 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney David B Marks . (Marks, David) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
5
pgs
order
Order Setting Requirements (Adv)
Mon 07/15 12:56 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 28 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Fleurimond, Lucie) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Mon 07/15 12:55 PM
Summons Issued on Disney Consumer Products, Inc. Answer Due 8/14/2019 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Fleurimond, Lucie) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/12 4:45 PM
Adversary case 19-01222 Complaint by Margaret J Smith against Disney Consumer Products, Inc.. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Marks, David) |