File v. Kastner et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lynn Adelman |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-01063 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 21, 2020 3:05 AM CST |
Defendant
Justice Shirley Abrahamson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Justice Ann Walsh Bradley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Justice Rebecca Bradley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Justice Rebecca F Dallet
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jill Kastner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Justice Daniel Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Larry Martin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patience Roggensack
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Justice Annette K Ziegler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schuyler File
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, May 23, 2022 | ||
45 | 45
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 05/23 9:27 AM
USCA Mandate (certified copy) 20-2387 The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (dl) |
|
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
44 | 44
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 07/28 2:43 PM
USCA Case Number 20-2387 re:39 Notice of Appeal, filed by Schuyler File. (dl) |
|
43 | 43
misc
Supplement
Tue 07/28 11:07 AM
SUPPLEMENT by Schuyler File Transcript Information Sheet . (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
42 | 42
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Tue 07/28 10:33 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re39 Notice of Appeal, (dl) |
|
41 | 41
appeal
Attorney Cover Letter
Tue 07/28 10:32 AM
Attorney Cover Letter re:39 Notice of Appeal,(dl) |
|
Att: 1 Docket Sheet | ||
40 | 40
appeal
Docketing Statement
Tue 07/28 10:01 AM
Docketing Statement by Schuyler File re39 Notice of Appeal, (cc: all counsel) (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
39 | 39
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 07/28 10:01 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to37 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Stay,,,38 Judgment by Schuyler File. Filing Fee PAID $505, receipt number AWIEDC-3522288 (cc: all counsel)(Suhr, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Disclosure Statement | ||
Monday, June 29, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
order
Judgment
Mon 06/29 4:27 PM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/29/20. (cc: all counsel)(jad) |
|
37 | 37
13
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 06/29 4:25 PM
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/29/20 ORDERED that the defendants' motions to dismiss the complaint for failure to state a claim14 &19 are GRANTED. The motions are denied to the extent they seek dismissal for lack of standing or on immunity grounds. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the supreme court justices' motion to stay16 is DENIED as MOOT. (cc: all counsel) (jad) |
|
36 | 36
13
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge
Mon 06/29 4:21 PM
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/29/20 denying29 Motion to Disqualify Judge. (cc: all counsel) (jad) |
|
Monday, June 08, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Supplement
Mon 06/08 11:27 AM
SUPPLEMENT by Jill Kastner, Larry Martin Letter re Supplemental Authority . (Howell, Roberta) |
|
Thursday, June 04, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Letter
Thu 06/04 2:20 PM
LETTER from Daniel Suhr, Counsel for Plaintiff re: dissent from denial of cert. in Jarchow .(Suhr, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit J. Thomas Dissent from Denial of Cert. | ||
Wednesday, June 03, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Letter
Wed 06/03 3:27 PM
LETTER from Clayton P. Kawski re: order denying Jarchow v. State Bar of Wisconsin cert petition . (Kawski, Clayton) |
|
Monday, March 30, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Letter
Mon 03/30 11:33 AM
LETTER from Roberta F. Howell to Judge Adelman . (Howell, Roberta) |
|
Wednesday, March 25, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Letter
Wed 03/25 10:51 AM
LETTER from Clayton P. Kawski re: Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify (Dkt. 29) . (Kawski, Clayton) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Thu 03/19 2:04 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Schuyler File re29 MOTION to Disqualify Judge Adelman .(Suhr, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
29 | 29
motion
Disqualify Judge
Thu 03/19 2:03 PM
MOTION to Disqualify Judge Adelman by Schuyler File. (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Letter
Tue 01/07 4:25 PM
LETTER from Clayton P. Kawski .(Kawski, Clayton) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Jarchow Order Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Jarchow Notice of Filing of Petition for Writ Certiorari | ||
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Reply Brief in Support of Motion
Fri 12/20 4:19 PM
REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Jill Kastner, Larry Martin re19 MOTION to Dismiss . (Howell, Roberta) |
|
26 | 26
respm
Reply Brief in Support of Motion
Fri 12/20 9:27 AM
REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Shirley Abrahamson, Ann Walsh Bradley, Rebecca Bradley, Rebecca F Dallet, Patience Roggensack, Annette K Ziegler re16 MOTION to Stay . (Kawski, Clayton) |
|
25 | 25
respm
Reply Brief in Support of Motion
Fri 12/20 9:26 AM
REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Shirley Abrahamson, Ann Walsh Bradley, Rebecca Bradley, Rebecca F Dallet, Patience Roggensack, Annette K Ziegler re14 MOTION to Dismiss . (Kawski, Clayton) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 12/06 2:31 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by Schuyler File re19 MOTION to Dismiss . (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 12/06 2:30 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by Schuyler File re14 MOTION to Dismiss . (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
22 | 22
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 12/06 2:27 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by Schuyler File re16 MOTION to Stay . (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 11/22 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Michael Murphy on behalf of Shirley Abrahamson, Ann Walsh Bradley, Rebecca Bradley, Rebecca F Dallet, Daniel Kelly, Patience Roggensack, Annette K Ziegler. Attorney(s) appearing: S. Michael Murphy (Murphy, Sean) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Fri 11/22 2:08 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Jill Kastner, Larry Martin re19 MOTION to Dismiss .(Howell, Roberta) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Notice for Fiscal Year 2020 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Fri 11/22 2:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Jill Kastner, Larry Martin. (Howell, Roberta) |
|
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Declaration
Fri 11/15 1:56 PM
DECLARATION of Clayton P. Kawski(Kawski, Clayton) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Dkt 1 (Complaint) 19CV266, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Dkt 16 (Def. Br. ISO Mot. to Dismiss) 19CV266, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Dkt 19 (Def. Br. ISO Mot. to Stay) 19CV266, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Text Order 19CV266, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Dkt 25 (Pla. Resp. to Defs. Mot. to Dismiss) 19CV266, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - 2019 Wis. Sup. Ct. Calendar | ||
17 | 17
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Fri 11/15 1:39 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Shirley Abrahamson, Ann Walsh Bradley, Rebecca Bradley, Rebecca F Dallet, Daniel Kelly, Patience Roggensack, Annette K Ziegler re16 MOTION to Stay . (Kawski, Clayton) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Stay
Fri 11/15 1:38 PM
MOTION to Stay by Shirley Abrahamson, Ann Walsh Bradley, Rebecca Bradley, Rebecca F Dallet, Daniel Kelly, Patience Roggensack, Annette K Ziegler. (Kawski, Clayton) |
|
15 | 15
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Fri 11/15 1:34 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Shirley Abrahamson, Ann Walsh Bradley, Rebecca Bradley, Rebecca F Dallet, Daniel Kelly, Patience Roggensack, Annette K Ziegler re14 MOTION to Dismiss . (Kawski, Clayton) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss
Fri 11/15 1:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Shirley Abrahamson, Ann Walsh Bradley, Rebecca Bradley, Rebecca F Dallet, Daniel Kelly, Patience Roggensack, Annette K Ziegler. (Kawski, Clayton) |
|
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
order
Text Only Order
Mon 09/30 1:18 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER Granting12 Stipulation for Extension of Time signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/30/19. (cc: all counsel)(jad) |
||
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/27 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Roberta F Howell on behalf of Jill Kastner, Larry Martin. Attorney(s) appearing: Roberta F. Howell (Howell, Roberta) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Fri 09/27 10:35 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time under FRCP 12 by Schuyler File. (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 09/24 11:06 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jill Kastner. Waiver sent on 9/23/2019; Larry Martin - Waiver sent on 9/23/2019. (Suhr, Daniel) Modified on 9/24/2019 (kah) |
|
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 09/24 10:58 AM
DISREGARD; WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jill Kastner - Waiver sent on 9/23/2019; Larry Martin - Waiver sent on 9/23/2019. (Suhr, Daniel) Modified per phone call on 9/24/2019 (kah) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 08/27 9:47 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rebecca Bradley - Waiver sent on 8/22/2019. (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 08/27 9:46 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rebecca F Dallet - Waiver sent on 8/22/2019. (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 08/27 9:45 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patience Roggensack - Waiver sent on 8/22/2019. (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 08/27 9:43 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Daniel Kelly - Waiver sent on 8/22/2019. (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 08/27 9:42 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shirley Abrahamson - Waiver sent on 8/22/2019. (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 08/27 9:40 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ann Walsh Bradley - Waiver sent on 8/22/2019. (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 08/27 9:38 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Annette K Ziegler - Waiver sent on 8/22/2019. (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 12:07 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jcl) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 07/25 9:53 AM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Schuyler File(Suhr, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons | ||
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/25 8:59 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Schuyler File. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3171453)(Suhr, Daniel) (ds) |
|
Att: 1 (7/25/2019) Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Thu 07/25 9:29 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds) |