Schuyler File v. Larry Martin, et al
Original Case: 2:19-cv-01063
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-02387 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 28, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 29, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday May 02, 2022 3:31 AM CDT |
Defendant
SHIRLEY S. ABRAHAMSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JILL M. KASTNER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LARRY MARTIN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PATIENCE D. ROGGENSACK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
SHIRLEY S. ABRAHAMSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ANN W. BRADLEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ANNETTE K. ZIEGLER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
REBECCA BRADLEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DANIEL KELLY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
REBECCA FRANK DALLET
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SCHULYER FILE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SCHUYLER FILE
|
Represented By
|
![]() Filed opinion of the court by Judge Sykes. AFFIRMED. Diane S. Sykes, Chief Judge; Diane P. Wood, Circuit Judge and David F. Hamilton, Circuit Judge. [7232896-1] [7232896] [20-2387] |
Docket last updated: 05/02/2022 3:30 AM CDT |
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 08/11/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 09/08/2020 for Schuyler File. [1] [7096791] 20-2387 --[Edited 07/30/2020 by JR.] (CG) [Entered: 07/28/2020 02:25 PM] | |
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |