Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc. et al v. Parson et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Phillips |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-04155 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 13, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Eighth Circuit, 19-02882 Eighth Circuit, 19-02882 and 19-03134 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2020 3:51 AM CST |
Defendant
MD Sammy L Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DO James A DiRenna
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kimberly M Gardner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffrey S Glaser
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MD Jade D James
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PhD, MPP, MPH Sarah Martin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Katherine J Mathews
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael L Parson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MD Naveed Razzaque
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MD Randall Williams
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eric S Schmitt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DO David E Tannehill
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MD, FACP Marc K Taormina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reproductive Health Services of Planned Parenthood of the St. Louis Region, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DO, MSCI, FACOG Colleen P. McNicholas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 13, 2022 | ||
95 | 95
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Wed 07/13 10:08 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs' request to dismiss the case without prejudice, (Doc. 92), is granted and the case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed on 7/13/22 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2022 | ||
94 | 94
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 07/11 8:47 AM
MANDATE of US COURT OF APPEALS as to70 and53 Notice of Appeal, filed by David E Tannehill, Randall Williams, Naveed Razzaque, Sarah Martin, Michael L Parson, Sammy L Alexander, Jade D James, Eric S Schmitt, James A DiRenna, Marc K Taormina, Jeffrey S Glaser, Katherine J Mathews,53 Notice of Appeal, filed by David E Tannehill, Randall Williams, Naveed Razzaque, Sarah Martin, Michael L Parson, Sammy L Alexander, Jade D James, Eric S Schmitt, James A DiRenna, Marc K Taormina, Jeffrey S Glaser, Katherine J Mathews with mandate issued on 07/08/2022. (Berner, Crystal) |
|
93 | 93
3
pgs
appeal
USCA Judgment and/or Opinion
Mon 07/11 8:34 AM
USCA Judgment as to53 and70 Notice of Appeal, filed by David E Tannehill, Randall Williams, Naveed Razzaque, Sarah Martin, Michael L Parson, Sammy L Alexander, Jade D James, Eric S Schmitt, James A DiRenna, Marc K Taormina, Jeffrey S Glaser, Katherine J Mathews This is a preliminary judgment and/or opinion of U.S. Court of Appeals; jurisdiction is not recovered until the Mandate is issued by the U.S Court of Appeals. (Berner, Crystal) |