Dunbar v. Jepsen et al
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Stefan R Underhill |
Referred: | William I Garfinkel |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-01163 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 29, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 17, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 25, 2020 3:13 AM EST |
Defendant
Marc Heinmiller
|
|
Defendant
Richard Mahoney
|
|
Defendant
Stephen Cowf
|
|
Defendant
David Montini
|
|
Defendant
Shawn Musial
|
|
Defendant
Joseph Pires
|
|
Defendant
Carlos Vasquez
|
|
Plaintiff
Timolyn Deneen Dunbar
Self-Litigant 849 Augusta Ave
Petersburg, VA 23803 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
James Duncan
Terminated: 08/21/2019
|
|
Defendant
George Jepsen
Terminated: 08/21/2019
|
|
Defendant
Joseph Pirez
Terminated: 08/21/2019
|
|
Defendant
Gilbert Valentine
Terminated: 08/21/2019
|
|
Defendant
Christopher Walsh
Terminated: 08/21/2019
|
GPO
Apr 24 2023
ORDER denying 28 Motion to Reopen Case; denying as moot 29 and 30 Motions to Present New Information to the Court. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/24/2023. (Hurley, S.) |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/24 6:31 PM
ORDER denying28 Motion to Reopen Case; denying as moot29 and30 Motions to Present New Information to the Court. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/24/2023. (Hurley, S.) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/28 2:04 PM
NOTICE re: Affidavit from Attorney James Mortimer by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar (Oliver, T.) |
|
Att: 1 copy of envelope | ||
Tuesday, February 21, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 02/22 1:16 PM
MOTION to Present Vital New Information by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. Responses due by 3/14/2023 (Oliver, T.) |
|
Att: 1 copy of envelope | ||
29 | 29
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 02/22 1:09 PM
MOTION to Present Vital New Information by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. Responses due by 3/14/2023 (Oliver, T.) |
|
Att: 1 copy of envelope | ||
28 | 28
motion
Reopen Case
Wed 02/22 1:08 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. Responses due by 3/14/2023 (Oliver, T.) |
|
Att: 1 copy of envelope | ||
Tuesday, March 23, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Tue 03/23 1:56 PM
ORDER denying26 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/23/2021. (Simon, K.) |
|
Friday, August 21, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Reopen Case
Mon 08/24 12:48 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. Responses due by 9/14/2020.(Fanelle, N.) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/24 12:39 PM
NOTICE Change of Address by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. (Fanelle, N.) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 07/16 12:24 PM
MANDATE of USCA dated 7/16/2020 DISMISSING18 Notice of Appeal filed by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar (Oliver, T.) |
|
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
appeal
Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal
Mon 11/04 9:02 AM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re:18 Notice of Appeal. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this transmission: none (Oliver, T.) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 11/01 5:12 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 11/1/2019. (Simon, K) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order
Fri 11/01 3:04 PM
ORDER: The Clerk is directed to re-open15 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 11/1/2019. (Simon, K) |
|
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 10/07 1:16 PM
NOTICE of USCA re: Pending Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis as to18 Notice of Appeal filed by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. USCA Case Number 19-3179 (Oliver, T.) |
|
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal
Tue 10/01 5:13 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re:18 Notice of Appeal. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this transmission: none (Oliver, T.) |
|
18 | 18
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 10/01 5:10 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to17 Judgment, by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar.(Oliver, T.) |
|
Att: 1 copy of envelope | ||
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment
Tue 09/17 6:13 PM
JUDGMENT, the complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim, and that the case is closed. For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 9/17/2019.(Jaiman, R.) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Recommended Ruling
Thu 09/12 4:39 PM
ORDER approving and adopting9 Recommended Ruling. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 9/12/2019. (Simon, K) Modified on 9/12/2019 (Jaiman, R.). (MODIFIED TO EDIT THE TEXT) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 08/22 1:02 PM
AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. (Oliver, T.) |
|
Att: 1 copy of envelope | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 08/22 1:00 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Marc Heinmiller, Richard Mahoney, David Montini, Shawn Musial, Stephen Cowf, Carlos Vasquez, Joseph Pires, filed by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. (Oliver, T.) |
|
13 | 13
respoth
Objection/Reply/Response to Recommended Ruling
Thu 08/22 12:53 PM
OBJECTION to9 Recommended Ruling filed by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. (Oliver, T.) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
motion
Order
Tue 08/13 4:07 PM
MOTION for by Pro Se Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. (Oliver, T.) |
|
Att: 1 copy of envelope | ||
11 | 11
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 08/13 4:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. (Oliver, T.) |
|
Att: 1 copy of envelope | ||
10 | 10
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 08/13 4:00 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. Responses due by 9/2/2019 (Oliver, T.) |
|
Att: 1 copy of envelope | ||
Thursday, August 08, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Recommended Ruling
Thu 08/08 11:06 AM
RECOMMENDED RULING : For the reasons set forth in the attached Recommended Ruling, the Undersigned recommends that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. sec. 1915(e)(2)(B). This is a Recommended Ruling. Any objection must be filed within 14 days after service. Objections due by 8/22/2019. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 8/8/19.(Cates, S) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 08/08 11:05 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. In addition, for the reasons set forth in the Recommended Ruling filed herewith, the Undersigned recommends that this action be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. sec. 1915(e)(2)(b). Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 8/8/19. (Cates, S) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 08/01 4:44 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for Motion for in Forma Pauperis including2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 8/1/2019.Motions referred to William I. Garfinkel(Jaiman, R.) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Mon 08/05 2:56 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2019. Discovery due by 1/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/3/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2019.(Fazekas, J.) |
|
5 | 5
order
Protective Order
Wed 07/31 11:37 AM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/29/2019.(Fazekas, J.) |
|
4 | 4
order
Electronic Filing Order
Wed 07/31 11:36 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/29/2019.(Fazekas, J.) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Wed 07/31 11:34 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines:. Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2019. Discovery due by 1/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/3/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2019.(Fazekas, J.) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/31 11:32 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar. (Fazekas, J.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/31 11:31 AM
COMPLAINT against James Duncan, Marc Heinmiller, George Jepsen, Richard Mahoney, Joseph Pirez, Gilbert Valentine, Christopher Walsh, filed by Timolyn Deneen Dunbar.(Fazekas, J.) |