Boudreaux v. Louisiana State Bar Association et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lance M Africk |
Referred: | Janis Van Meerveld |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-11962 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 01, 2019 |
Re-opened: | Dec 05, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 28, 2020 2:26 AM CST |
Defendant
Marcus R. Clark
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott J. Crichton
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James T Genovese
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jefferson D Hughes, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bernette J Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Louisiana State Bar Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Louisiana Supreme Court
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John L Weimer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unidentified Party
|
|
Plaintiff
Randy Boudreaux
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
133 | 133
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Vacate
Mon 03/25 12:12 PM
ORDER granting132 Joint MOTION to Vacate re131 Briefing Schedule . The briefing schedule regarding Boudreaux's request for attorneys' fees and costs is vacated. FURTHER ORDERED that the portion of this Court's judgment regarding Boudreaux's request for attorneys' fees and costs is satisfied. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 03/25/2024. (ko) Modified text on 3/25/2024 (ko) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
132 | 132
motion
Vacate
Fri 03/22 8:57 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Vacate131 Briefing Schedule by Marcus R. Clark, Scott J. Crichton, James T Genovese, Jefferson D Hughes, III, Bernette J Johnson, Louisiana State Bar Association, Louisiana Supreme Court, John L Weimer.(Stanley, Richard) Modified text on 3/22/2024 (ko) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |