Boudreaux v. LA State Bar Assoc
Original Case: 2:19-cv-11962
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-pcf-30564 |
Type | private civil federal / private |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Case Filed: | Sep 06, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 17, 2023 3:14 PM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
Louisiana State Bar Association, a Louisiana Nonprofit Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Louisiana Supreme Court
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bernette J. Johnson, Chief Justice of the Louisiana Supreme Court
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Scott J. Crichton, Associate Justice of the Louisiana Supreme Court for the Second District
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
James T. Genovese, Associate Justice of the Louisiana Supreme Court for the Third District
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Marcus R. Clark, Associate Justice of the Louisiana Supreme Court for the Fourth District
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jefferson D. Hughes, III, Associate Justice of the Louisiana Supreme Court for the Fifth District
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John L. Weimer, Associate Justice of the Louisiana Supreme Court for the Sixth District
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Unidentified Party, successor to the Honorable Greg Guidry as Associate Justice of the Louisiana Supreme Court for the First District
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Randy Boudreaux
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 13 2023
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [22-30564 Affirmed in Part ] Judge: CDK , Judge: JES , Judge: JWE Mandate issue date is 12/05/2023 [22-30564] |
Docket last updated: 11/17/2023 3:14 PM CST |
Tuesday, September 06, 2022 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Randy Boudreaux. 22-30564 (SEP) |