Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott M Grossman
Case #: 0:19-bk-20513
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2019
Terminated:Jun 29, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
East Coast Invest, LLC
1000 S Federal Hwy Ste 200
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316-1237
Represented By
Grace E. Robson, Esq.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 08/05/2019 8:00 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 06, 2019
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 08/06 4:16 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-20513 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 34813752. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF] Tue 08/06 3:15 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1717] (Robson, Grace)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 08/06 3:16 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor East Coast Invest, LLC. (Robson, Grace)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Tue 08/06 4:49 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Robert P. Charbonneau Esq. Filed by Creditor Cross Gen Finance, LLC. (Charbonneau, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Motion Tue 08/06 5:00 PM
Motion (1) Recognize Powers and Duties of Receiver (2) Set Compensation for Receiver, and Alternatively, (3) Excuse Receiver from Compliance with Turnover Requirements Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Debtor East Coast Invest, LLC (Robson, Grace)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Employ Tue 08/06 5:03 PM
Application to Employ Barry Mukamal as Accountants and Financial Advisors [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor East Coast Invest, LLC (Robson, Grace)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Tue 08/06 5:03 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Jesse R Cloyd Filed by Creditor Cross Gen Finance, LLC. (Cloyd, Jesse)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Employ Tue 08/06 5:04 PM
Application to Employ Grace E. Robson as Attorney [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor East Coast Invest, LLC (Robson, Grace)
Related: [-]
14 14 court Notice of Deficiency Thu 08/08 2:19 PM
Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 8/13/2019]. List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Due: 8/13/2019. List of Equity Security Holders due 8/20/2019. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 8/20/2019. Schedule A/B due 8/20/2019. Schedule D due 8/20/2019. Schedule E/F due 8/20/2019. Schedule G due 8/20/2019. Schedule H due 8/20/2019.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 8/20/2019.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 8/20/2019. [Incomplete Filings due by 8/20/2019]. (Weldon, Melva)
Related: [-]