Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 0:19-bk-20513

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Paul G Hyman, Jr
Case #: 0:20-ap-01128
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2020
Terminated:Jan 04, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cross Gen Finance, LLC
Agentis, PLLC 55 Alhambra Plaza, Suite 800
Coral Gbles, FL 33134
Represented By
Cross Gen Finance, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Igor Mikhaylov
One Southeast Third Ave One Suite 1400
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Hayley G Harrison
contact info
Plaintiff
Artem Zhgun as Trustee of the Igor Mikhaylov 2015 Irrevocable Trust
Bast Amron LLP One Southeast Third Ave Suite 1400
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Hayley G Harrison
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, January 04, 2021
73 73 court Close Adversary Case Mon 01/04 8:38 AM
Adversary Case 0:20-ap-1128 Closed. Final Judgment in Favor of Defendant (Gomez, Edy)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 01, 2021
72 72 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/02 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/01/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 68 Notice of Entry (Re:67 Final Judgment in Favor of Defendant, Cross Gen Finance, LLC Against Plaintiffs Igor Mikhaylov, and Artem Zhgun, as Trustee of the Igor Mikhaylov 2015 Irrevocable Trust.)
71 71 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 01/02 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 01/01/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 67 Final Judgment in Favor of Defendant, Cross Gen Finance, LLC Against Plaintiffs Igor Mikhaylov, and Artem Zhgun, as Trustee of the Igor Mikhaylov 2015 Irrevocable Trust.
70 70 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 01/02 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 01/01/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 66 Order Granting Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment (Re:46 )
69 69 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/02 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/01/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 68 Notice of Entry (Re:67 Final Judgment in Favor of Defendant, Cross Gen Finance, LLC Against Plaintiffs Igor Mikhaylov, and Artem Zhgun, as Trustee of the Igor Mikhaylov 2015 Irrevocable Trust.)
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
68 68 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Wed 12/30 1:05 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Ramos-White, Madeline)
Related: [-] 67 Final Judgment in Favor of Defendant, Cross Gen Finance, LLC Against Plaintiffs Igor Mikhaylov, and Artem Zhgun, as Trustee of the Igor Mikhaylov 2015 Irrevocable Trust.
67 67 order Judgment Wed 12/30 1:01 PM
Final Judgment in Favor of Defendant, Cross Gen Finance, LLC Against Plaintiffs Igor Mikhaylov, and Artem Zhgun, as Trustee of the Igor Mikhaylov 2015 Irrevocable Trust. (Ramos-White, Madeline)
Related: [-]
66 66 order Summary Judgment Order Wed 12/30 11:28 AM
Order Granting Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Related [+] (Ramos-White, Madeline)
Related: [-] #46