Roger Huffman v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-07175 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Aug 19, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 01, 2020 |
Case in other court: | California Eastern, 2:18-cv-01632 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2020 12:14 AM PST |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Huffman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 01, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Dismissing Case
Tue 07/07 4:59 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR OMNIBUS REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE REGARDING CERTAIN CLR PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED HEREIN by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr.: Pursuant to the parties Stipulation, Master MDL Case No. 2:18-ml-02814 AB (FFMx), Dkt. No. 823, the cases identified in this order, including all claims stated herein against all parties, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. See document for further details. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-07781-AB-FFM et al. (gk) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Wed 08/21 12:44 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Wed 08/21 4:25 PM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (car) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 08/21 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Wed 08/21 4:21 PM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - CTO-30 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 8/15/2019 regarding transfer of Case No. 2:18-cv-01632-JAM-KJN from Eastern District of California - Live System (Sacramento). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-02814-AB-FFMx. (car) |
|
3 | 3 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to District of Central District of California. CASE CLOSED. Electronic Record Sent. (Donati, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2019.] | |
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Becknal, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 Order re Filing Requirements, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior Court, case number 34-2018 00232682 by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7699596)(Lambert, Kristina) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Interested Entities, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of Counsel, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet |