Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-11984

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:19-bk-11988
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Summit Properties - Jacksboro, LLC
2001 Bryan St Ste 1550
Dallas, TX 75201-3011
Represented By
Derek C. Abbott
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Monday, April 26, 2021
8 8 court Case Reassigned Mon 04/26 4:32 PM
Order Reassigning Case. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2020
7 7 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Mon 01/06 7:32 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Wing Chan of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 6
Thursday, January 02, 2020
6 6 2 pgs order Order Thu 01/02 3:11 PM
Order Authorizing The Modification of the Caption in the Debtors' Jointly Administered Cases. Signed on 1/2/2020 (DMC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2019
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Thu 11/14 10:49 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Summit Properties - Jacksboro, LLC. (Barsalona II, Joseph)
Related: [-]
4 4 30+ pgs misc Schedules/Statements Thu 11/14 10:49 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Summit Properties - Jacksboro, LLC. (Barsalona II, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 09/10 4:20 PM
An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Freds, Inc., Case No. 19-11984 for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Freds, Inc., Case No. 19-11984 should be consulted for all matters concerning this case. Signed on 9/10/2019 (DMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2019
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 09/09 10:06 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-11988 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9443826, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 09/09 8:22 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Summit Properties - Jacksboro, LLC. (Abbott, Derek)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 09/09 8:35 AM
Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case (LB)
Related: [-]