Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:19-bk-11984
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2019
Plan Confirmed:Jun 04, 2020

Debtor
Fred's, Inc.
2001 Bryan St Ste 1550
Dallas, TX 75201-3011
Represented By
Derek C. Abbott
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801

Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
2057 2057 claims Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/18 12:23 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Betina Wheelon . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 2049 ,2050 ,2051 ,2052 ,2053 ,2054 ,2055 ,2056
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
2056 2056 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 04/16 1:00 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 19-11989 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
2055 2055 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 04/16 12:58 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 19-11988 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
2054 2054 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 04/16 12:57 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 19-11987 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
2053 2053 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 04/16 12:56 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 19-11986 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
2052 2052 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 04/16 12:55 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 19-11985 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
2051 2051 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 04/16 12:53 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 19-11983 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
2050 2050 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 04/16 12:52 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 19-11982 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
2049 2049 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 04/16 12:50 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
2048 2048 claims Claims Register Wed 04/16 11:21 AM
Quarterly Claims Register Numerical . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-]
2047 2047 claims Claims Register Wed 04/16 11:20 AM
Quarterly Claims Register Alphabetical . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-]