Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-45422

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:19-bk-45425
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2019
Terminated:Sep 11, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Gasport, LLC
4540 Lincoln Dr
Gasport, NY 14067-9212
Represented By
Schuyler G. Carroll
Loeb & Loeb LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn Office) U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Suite 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 6:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
2 2 motion Joint Administration Wed 09/11 12:16 AM
Motion for Joint Administration of Case 19-45422 with Case(s) 19-45423 19-45424 19-45425 19-45426 19-45427 19-45428 19-45429 Filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Gasport, LLC. (Carroll, Schuyler)
Related: [-]
court Case Related to a Chapter 11 Wed 09/11 8:12 AM
The above case is related to 19-45422 ess Absolut Facilities Management, LLC 19-45423 ess Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Allegany, LLC; 19-45424 ess Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Aurora Park, LLC; 19-45426 ess Absolut at Orchard Brooke, LLC; 19-45427 ess Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Orchard Park, LLC; 19-45428 ess Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Three Rivers, LLC; 19-45429 ess Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Westfield, LLC (cjm)
Related: [-]
court Intra-Office Transfer (Bankruptcy) Wed 09/11 10:55 AM
Pursuant to standing order dated 3/21/2002, case number 19-45425 is hereby transferred to the appropriate office under case number 19-76268 (cjm)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 09/11 10:56 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (cjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
1 1 19 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 09/10 11:13 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Gasport, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 01/8/2020. Disclosure Statement due by 01/8/2020. (Carroll, Schuyler)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Tue 09/10 11:15 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(1 19-45425 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18415707. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1