New York Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Warren, USBJ
Case #: 2:19-bk-20905
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
The Diocese of Rochester
1150 Buffalo Road
Rochester, NY 14624
Represented By
Sara C. Temes
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Grayson T. Walter
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Ingrid S. Palermo
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Charles J. Sullivan
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 12, 2022 10:03 AM EST
Accountant
Bonadio & Co., LLP
171 Sully's Trail
Pittsford, NY 14534
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Kathleen Dunivin Schmitt
Office of the United States Trustee 100 State Street, Room 6090
Rochester, NY 14614
Attorney
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
Represented By
Ilan D Scharf
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Attorney
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
One Lincoln Center
Syracuse, NY 13202
Creditor
Kathleen Israel
Represented By
Jarrod W. Smith
Jarrod W. Smith, Esq. P.L.L.C.
contact info
Creditor
SHC-MG-2 Doe
Law Offices of Mitchell Garabedian 100 State Street 6th Floor
Boston, MA 02109
Represented By
Mitchell Garabedian
Law Offices Of Mitchell Garabedian
contact info
Creditor
Certain Sexual Abuse Claimants
Represented By
Scott Michael Duquin
Hoganwillig
contact info
Creditor
31 Claimants
Marsh Law Firm PLLC 151 East Post Road Suite 102
White Plains, NY 10601
Represented By
Adam Horowitz
Horowitz Law
contact info
James R Marsh
Marsh Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Claimant MM
151 E Post Rd Ste 102
White Plains, NY 10601
Represented By
Charles J. Sullivan
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
James R Marsh
Marsh Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Creditor
M.G.
31 Hudson Yards 11th Floor
New York, NY 10001
Represented By
James R Marsh
Marsh Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Kenneth Cubiotti
1626 Lincoln Way
Coeur d Alene, ID 83814
Represented By
Leander Laurel James, IV
James, Vernon & Weeks, P.A.
contact info
Brianna M Espeland
James, Vernon & Weeks, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
LCVAWCR-DOE
Represented By
Victoria Phillips
Phillips & Paolicelli, LLP
contact info
Steve Phillips
Phillips & Paolicelli, LLP
contact info
Creditor
CW187 DOE
1626 Lincoln Way
Coeur d'Alene, ID 83814
Represented By
Leander Laurel James, IV
James, Vernon & Weeks, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
GM127 DOE
1626 Lincoln Way 1626 Lincoln Way
Coeur d'Alene, ID 83814
Represented By
Leander Laurel James, IV
James, Vernon & Weeks, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
JP185 DOE
1626 Lincoln Way 1626 Lincoln Way
Coeur d'Alene, ID 83814
Represented By
Leander Laurel James, IV
James, Vernon & Weeks, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
LCVAWCR DOE
Represented By
Diane Paolicelli
Phillips & Paolicelli, LLP
contact info
Creditor
MG133 DOE
1626 Lincoln Way
Coeur d'Alene, ID 83814
Represented By
Leander Laurel James, IV
James, Vernon & Weeks, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Donna Oppedisano
Represented By
Jarrod W. Smith
Jarrod W. Smith, Esq. P.L.L.C.
contact info
Creditor
R.O.
31 Hudson Yards 11th Floor
New York, NY 10001
Represented By
James R Marsh
Marsh Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Carol Dupre
and various other individual creditors 50 Maier Circle
Spencerport, NY 14599
Represented By
Mitchell Garabedian
Law Offices Of Mitchell Garabedian
contact info
William Henry Gordon
Law Offices Of Mitchell Garabedian
contact info
Creditor
Victor Rivera
75 Hinchey Road
Rochester<, NY 14624
Represented By
Mitchell Garabedian
Law Offices Of Mitchell Garabedian
contact info
Creditor
Thomas David Adams
36 Vermont Court
Asheville, NC 28806
Represented By
Nathaniel Foote
Andreozzi & Foote
contact info
Renee E. Franchi
Andreozzi & Foote
contact info
Creditor
S.B.
31 Hudson Yards 11th Floor
New York, NY 10001
Represented By
James R Marsh
Marsh Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Creditor
BB 44
Law Offices of Mitchell Garabedian 100 State Street 6th Floor
Boston, MA 02109
Represented By
Mitchell Garabedian
Law Offices Of Mitchell Garabedian
contact info
Creditor
VJR 41
Law Offices of Mitchell Garabedian 100 State Street 6th Floor
Boston, MA 02109
Represented By
Mitchell Garabedian
Law Offices Of Mitchell Garabedian
contact info
Creditor
DG 278
Law Offices of Mitchell Garabedian 100 State Street 6th Floor
Boston, MA 02109
Represented By
Mitchell Garabedian
Law Offices Of Mitchell Garabedian
contact info
Creditor
MS 275
Law Offices of Mitchell Garabedian 100 State Street 6th Floor
Boston, MA 02109
Represented By
Mitchell Garabedian
Law Offices Of Mitchell Garabedian
contact info
Creditor
SM 247
Law Offices of Mitchell Garabedian 100 State Street 6th Floor
Boston, MA 02109
Represented By
Mitchell Garabedian
Law Offices Of Mitchell Garabedian
contact info
Creditor
The Chubb Companies
Represented By
Catherine Beideman Heitzenrater
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Creditor
Patrick J. Hynes
1513 Langdon Village Drive
Clemmons, NC 27012
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Shirley S. Cho
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
James K.T. Hunter
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Jesse Bair
Burns Bowen Bair LLP
contact info
Ilan D Scharf
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
James I. Stang
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Timothy Burns
Burns Bowen Bair LLP
contact info
Financial Advisor
Berkeley Research Group, LLC
70 W. Madison St., Suite 5000
Chicago, IL 60602
Interested Party
London Market Insurers
Represented By
Peter Garthwaite
Clyde & Co Us LLP
contact info
Alexandra M Olkowski
Clyde & Co LLP
contact info
Jeff Kahane
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Russell Webb Roten
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Catalina Sugayan
Clyde & Co LLP
contact info
Mohammad Tehrani
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Sarah Rachelle Hertz
Clyde & Co LLP
contact info
Andrew Mina
Duane Morris
contact info
Interested Party
National Surety Corporation
Represented By
Charles Edwin Jones
Moss & Barnett, A Professional Association
contact info
Peter P. McNamara
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Siobhain Patricia Minarovich
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Matt Roberts
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
Harris Winsberg
Troutman Sanders
contact info
Interested Party
Interstate Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By
Charles Edwin Jones
Moss & Barnett, A Professional Association
contact info
Peter P. McNamara
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Siobhain Patricia Minarovich
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Matt Roberts
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
Russell Webb Roten
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Harris Winsberg
Troutman Sanders
contact info
Interested Party
Gannett Co., Inc.
175 Sully's Trail 3rd Floor
Pittsford, NY 14534
Represented By
Michael J Grygiel
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Kelly McNamee
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Interested Party
Continental Insurance Company
David Christian Attorneys LLC 105 W. Madison St. 14th Floor
Chicago, IL 60602
Represented By
Jean-Paul Jaillet
C/o Choate Hall And Stewart
contact info
Craig Goldblatt
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
Todd S. Schenk
Tressler LLP
contact info
David Christian, II
David Christian Attorneys LLC
contact info
Michael J. DiSantis
Tressler LLP
contact info
Isley Markman Gostin
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Kevin J. Finnerty
Choate Hall & Stewart LLP
contact info
Jennifer Smith
Tressler LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Austin Dove
Barclay Damon LLP
contact info
David Attisani
Choate Hall & Stewart LLP
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
Swiss Re America Corporation as Administrator
Represented By
Dirk C. Haarhoff
Kenney Shelton Liptak Nowak LLP
contact info
Kaitlin M. Calov
Walker Wilcox Matousek LLP
contact info
Judith Treger Shelton
Kenney Shelton Liptak Nowak LLP
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
Sexual Abuse Survivor/Creditor
Trevett Cristo Two State Street, Suite 1000
Rochester, NY 14614
Represented By
Adam Horowitz
Horowitz Law
contact info
Kathleen Thomas
Thomas Counselor At Law, Llc.
contact info
Melanie Wolk
Trevett Cristo
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
1 - Doe AB
Represented By
Stephen Boyd
Steve Boyd, PC
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
Ad Hoc Parish Committee
Timothy P. Lyster, Esq. 1900 Bausch & Lomb Place
Rochester, NY 14604
Represented By
Timothy Patrick Lyster
Woods Oviatt Gilman LLP
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
St. Bernard's School of Theology and Ministry
Represented By
Paul L. Leclair
Adams Leclair LLP
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
People of the State of New York
Charities Bureau 28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005
Represented By
Louis J. Testa
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
St. Joseph's Villa
3300 Dewey Avenue
Rochester, NY 14616
Represented By
Devin L. Palmer
Boylan, Code LLP
contact info
Eric John Ward
Ward Greenberg Heller & Reidy LLP
contact info
Katerina Marie Kramarchyk
Ward Greenberg Heller & Reidy LLP
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
Donna Oppedisano
Represented By
Jarrod W. Smith
Jarrod W. Smith, Esq. P.L.L.C.
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
Camp Stella Maris of Livonia
4395 E. Lake Road
Livonia, NY 14487
Represented By
Devin L. Palmer
Boylan, Code LLP
contact info
Eric John Ward
Ward Greenberg Heller & Reidy LLP
contact info
Katerina Marie Kramarchyk
Ward Greenberg Heller & Reidy LLP
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
Catholic Charities of the Diocese of Rochester
1150 Buffalo Road
Rochester, NY 14624
Represented By
Devin L. Palmer
Boylan, Code LLP
contact info
Eric John Ward
Ward Greenberg Heller & Reidy LLP
contact info
Katerina Marie Kramarchyk
Ward Greenberg Heller & Reidy LLP
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
National Surety Corporation
600 Peachtree St. NE Suite 3000
Atlanta, GA 30308
Represented By
Charles Edwin Jones
Moss & Barnett, A Professional Association
contact info
Harris Winsberg
Troutman Sanders
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
Catholic Youth Organization
905 Monroe Avenue
Rochester, NY 14620
Represented By
Devin L. Palmer
Boylan, Code LLP
contact info
Eric John Ward
Ward Greenberg Heller & Reidy LLP
contact info
Katerina Marie Kramarchyk
Ward Greenberg Heller & Reidy LLP
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
Merson Law, PLLC
Merson Law, PLLC 950 Third Avenue 18th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Matthew Griffin Merson
Merson Law, PLLC
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company
Hodgson Russ LLP 140 Pearl Street Suite 100
Buffalo, NY 14202
Represented By
Garry M. Graber
Hodgson, Russ
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
Bishop Emeritus Matthew H. Clark
Represented By
Mary Jo Korona
Adams Leclair LLP
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
Continental Insurance Company
Attn: Jeffrey A. Dove, Esq. Barclay Damon Tower 125 East Jefferson Street
Syracuse, NY 13202
Represented By
Jean-Paul Jaillet
C/o Choate Hall And Stewart
contact info
Craig Goldblatt
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
David Christian, II
David Christian Attorneys LLC
contact info
Isley Markman Gostin
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Danielle Spinelli
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Lauren Lifland
Wilmerhale
contact info
Jeffrey Austin Dove
Barclay Damon LLP
contact info
David Attisani
Choate Hall & Stewart LLP
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
Kenneth G. Cubiotti
James Vernon & Weeks P.A. 1626 Lincoln Way
Coeur d Alene, ID 83814
Represented By
Leander Laurel James, IV
James, Vernon & Weeks, P.A.
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
Jeff Anderson & Associates
366 Jackson Street
St. Paul, MN 55101
Represented By
Michael Finnegan
Jeff Anderson & Associates
contact info
Elin Lindstrom
Jeff Anderson & Associates
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
Kathleen Israel
Represented By
Jarrod W. Smith
Jarrod W. Smith, Esq. P.L.L.C.
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
Brian S. Delafranier
1626 Lincoln Way
Coeur d'Alene, ID 83814
Represented By
Brianna M Espeland
James, Vernon & Weeks, P.A.
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
Interstate Fire and Casualty Company
600 Peachtree St. NE Suite 3000
Atlanta, GA 30308
Represented By
Charles Edwin Jones
Moss & Barnett, A Professional Association
contact info
Harris Winsberg
Troutman Sanders
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
Amaryllis Figueroa
19 West Main Street Suite 250 Suite 250
Rochester, NY 14614
Represented By
Lucien A. Morin, II
Mcconville, Considine, Cooman & Morin, PC
contact info
Notice of Appearance Creditor
Thomas LaBarbera Counselors At Law PC
Represented By
Anne Louise LaBarbera
Thomas Labarbera Counselors At Law Professional Corporation
contact info
Other Professional
Stretto
410 Exchange, Ste. 100
Irvine, CA 92602
Other Professional
Bankruptcy Management Solutions, Inc.
Other Professional
The Claro Group, LLC
123 N. Wacker Dr. Suite 2100
Chicago, IL 60606
Principal
Lisa M. Passero
The Diocese of Rochester 1150 Buffalo Road
Rochester, NY 14624
Special Counsel
Nixon Peabody, LLP
1300 Clinton Square
Rochester, NY 14604
Special Counsel
Blank Rome, LLP
1825 Eye Street NW
Washington, DC 20006
Represented By
James Carter, Jr
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
James R Murray
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Special Counsel
Burns Bowen Bair LLP
One South Pinckney St. Suite 930
Madison, WI 53703
Special Counsel
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown LLC
1201 N. Orange Street Suite 300
Wilmington, DE 19801
Special Counsel
James R Murray
Blank Rome LLP 1825 Eye Street NW
Washington, DC 20006
Represented By
James R Murray
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Special Counsel
Harris Beach PLLC
99 Garnsey Road
Pittsford, NY 14534
Represented By
Lee E. Woodard
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Kathleen Dunivin Schmitt
Office of the United States Trustee 100 State Street, Room 6090
Rochester, NY 14614
U.S. Trustee
William K. Harrington
Office of The United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Suite 1006
New York, NY 10014
Represented By
Shannon Anne Scott
Doj-Ust
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Creditor
PC-32 DOE
Terminated: 06/30/2021
Represented By
Diane Paolicelli
Phillips & Paolicelli, LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 16 2020
Written Opinion. (DUPLICATE ENTRY. DOCKETED FOR SEARCHABILITY PURPOSES ONLY) Signed on 4/16/2020 (Folwell, T.)
GPO Jul 29 2020
Written Opinion. (DUPLICATE ENTRY. DOCKETED FOR SEARCHABILITY PURPOSES ONLY) Signed on 7/29/2020 (Lawson, L.)
GPO Dec 08 2023
Written Opinion. (DUPLICATE ENTRY. DOCKETED FOR SEARCHABILITY PURPOSES ONLY) Signed on 12/8/2023 (Folwell, T.)
GPO Feb 16 2024
Written Opinion. (DUPLICATE ENTRY. DOCKETED FOR SEARCHABILITY PURPOSES ONLY) Signed on 2/16/2024 (Folwell, T.)
GPO Mar 01 2024
Written Opinion. (DUPLICATE ENTRY. DOCKETED FOR SEARCHABILITY PURPOSES ONLY) Signed on 3/1/2024 (Folwell, T.)
GPO Mar 05 2024
CORRECTED Written Opinion. (DUPLICATE ENTRY. DOCKETED FOR SEARCHABILITY PURPOSES ONLY) Signed on 3/1/2024 (Folwell, T.)
GPO Oct 07 2024
Written Opinion. (DUPLICATE ENTRY. DOCKETED FOR SEARCHABILITY PURPOSES ONLY) Signed on 10/7/2024 (Folwell, T.)
GPO Feb 25 2025
Written Opinion. (DUPLICATE ENTRY. DOCKETED FOR SEARCHABILITY PURPOSES ONLY) Signed on 2/25/2025 (Folwell, T.)
GPO Mar 11 2025
Written Opinion. (DUPLICATE ENTRY. DOCKETED FOR SEARCHABILITY PURPOSES ONLY) Signed on 3/11/2025 (Folwell, T.)
Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 12:00 PM EDT
Saturday, May 03, 2025
3097 3097 misc Document - CALL THE COURT BEFORE USING THIS Sat 05/03 7:30 AM
Document. Supplement to Motion Approving Form and Manner of Notice of Diocese's Motion to Approve Proposed Insurance Settlements and Setting Hearings and Objection Deadlines Related to Same Filed on behalf of Debtor The Diocese of Rochester. Related [+] Filed by Attorney (Walter, Grayson)
Related: [-] 3072 Motion to Compromise, Motion for Sale of Property
Friday, May 02, 2025
3096 3096 misc Document - CALL THE COURT BEFORE USING THIS Fri 05/02 5:02 PM
Document. Monthly Fee Statement of Burns Bair LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Special Insurance Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of The Diocese of Rochester for the Period April 1, 2025 through April 30, 2025. Filed on behalf of Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Filed by Attorney (Bair, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 01, 2025
3095 3095 claims Certificate of Service (FOR CLAIMS/NOTICING AGENTS ONLY) Thu 05/01 8:12 PM
Certificate of Service re: Notice of Filing of Plan Supplement to Eighth Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization for the Diocese of Rochester Dated March 14, 2025 (Docket No. 3079). Filed by Claims Agent Filed by Other Professional Stretto. (Vandell, Travis)
Related: [-]
3094 3094 utility Terminate Attorney Thu 05/01 3:14 PM
Terminated Attorney Beth Ann Bivona (TEXT ONLY EVENT) (Teutonico, C.)
Related: [-]
3093 3093 misc Document - CALL THE COURT BEFORE USING THIS Thu 05/01 10:56 AM
Document. Certificate of No Objection to Harris Beach Murtha Cullina's Sixty-Second Monthly Fee Statement. Filed on behalf of Special Counsel Harris Beach PLLC. Related [+] Filed by Attorney (Flynn, Terrance)
Related: [-] 3062 Document
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
3092 3092 order Appear pro hac vice Thu 05/01 10:33 AM
Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Timothy Karcher Related [+]. Signed on 5/1/2025. (Teutonico, C.)
Related: [-] (s):3082 Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
3091 3091 misc Ch. 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Wed 04/30 4:33 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 3/31/2025; Filed on behalf of Debtor The Diocese of Rochester. Filed by Attorney (Temes, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedules to March 2025 Monthly Operating Report
3090 3090 misc Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Wed 04/30 2:54 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. Bivona, Beth Filed on behalf of Interested Party Continental Insurance Company. Filed by Attorney (Bivona, Beth)
Related: [-]
3089 3089 answer Response Wed 04/30 2:03 PM
Response to : Final Report of Lori Lapin Jones, Esq., Independent Fee Examiner, On Prior and Pending Interim Applications for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Retained Professionals Related [+]. Filed on behalf of Examiner Lori Lapin Jones (Jones, Lori)
Related: [-] ument3016 Application for Compensation,3018 Application for Compensation,3019 Application for Compensation,3020 Application for Compensation,3021 Application for Compensation,3022 Application for Compensation,3023 Amended Application
3088 3088 utility Add Attorney Wed 04/30 1:20 PM
Attorney Mark Bruh for AUST Erin Champion, 11 added to case (TEXT ONLY EVENT) (Czaja, L.)
Related: [-]
3087 3087 utility Utility - Add AUST to case(batch) Wed 04/30 12:51 PM
Erin Champion, AUST, added to the case. (TEXT ONLY EVENT) (Czaja, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3086 3086 misc Notice-Generic Tue 04/29 7:13 PM
Notice re: / Notice of Data Security Incident Filed on behalf of Financial Advisor Berkeley Research Group, LLC. Filed by Attorney (Karcher, Timothy)
Related: [-]
3085 3085 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (BK) Tue 04/29 7:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Timothy Quaid Karcher of Proskauer Rose LLP. Filed on behalf of Notice of Appearance Creditor Berkeley Research Group, LLC. Filed by Attorney (Karcher, Timothy)
Related: [-]
3084 3084 claims Certificate of Service (FOR CLAIMS/NOTICING AGENTS ONLY) Tue 04/29 6:52 PM
Certificate of Service re: Monthly Fee Statement of Blank Rome LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Special Insurance Counsel to the Diocese of Rochester for the Period March 1, 2025 Through March 31, 2025 (Docket No. 3076). Filed by Claims Agent Filed by Other Professional Stretto. (Vandell, Travis)
Related: [-]
3083 3083 claims Certificate of Service (FOR CLAIMS/NOTICING AGENTS ONLY) Tue 04/29 6:50 PM
Certificate of Service re: Notice of Motion for Entry of an Order Approving the Form and Manner of Notice of Motion to Approve Proposed Insurance Settlement Agreements and Policy Buy- Backs (Docket No. 3074). Filed by Claims Agent Filed by Other Professional Stretto. (Vandell, Travis)
Related: [-]
3082 3082 motion Appear pro hac vice Tue 04/29 6:46 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Timothy Karcher Filed on behalf of Financial Advisor Berkeley Research Group, LLC (Karcher, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing
Att: 2 Proposed Order
3081 3081 misc Document - CALL THE COURT BEFORE USING THIS Tue 04/29 2:07 PM
Document. Certificate of No Objection Related to Burns Bair LLP's March 2025 Monthly Fee Statement. Filed on behalf of Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Related [+] Filed by Attorney (Bair, Jesse)
Related: [-] 3060 Document