Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-20905

New York Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Warren, USBJ
Case #: 2:19-ap-02021
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Continental Insurance Company, Defendant
Represented By
The Continental Insurance Company
contact info
Defendant
Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Defendant
Represented By
Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
contact info
Defendant
Certain London Market Companies, Defendant
Represented By
Certain London Market Companies
contact info
Defendant
The Dominion Insurance Company Limited, Defendant
Represented By
The Dominion Insurance Company Limited
contact info
Defendant
Stronghold Insurance Company Limited, Defendant
Represented By
Stronghold Insurance Company Limited
contact info
Defendant
CX Reinsurance Company Limited, Defendatn
Represented By
CX Reinsurance Company Limited
contact info
Defendant
Markel International Insurance Company Limited, Defendant
Represented By
Markel International Insurance Company Limited
contact info
Defendant
Tenecom Limited, Defendant
Represented By
Tenecom Limited
contact info
Defendant
National Surety Corporation, Defendant
Represented By
National Surety Corporation
contact info
Defendant
Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, Defendant
Represented By
Interstate Fire & Casualty Company
contact info
Defendant
Colonial Penn Insurance, Defendant
Represented By
Colonial Penn Insurance
contact info
Defendant
HDI Global Specialty SE, Defendant
Represented By
HDI Global Specialty SE
contact info
Plaintiff
The Diocese of Rochester, Plaintiff
1150 Buffalo Road
Rochester, NY 14624
Represented By
Stephen A. Donato
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
Charles J. Sullivan
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info

GPO Apr 25 2023
Written Opinion. (DUPLICATE ENTRY. DOCKETED FOR SEARCHABILITY PURPOSES ONLY) Signed on 4/25/2023 (Folwell, T.) CLERK'S NOTE: ORDER TEMPORARILY VACATED PER ORDER AT ECF NO. 237. Modified on 5/8/2023 (Lawson, L.).

Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
275 275 court Hearing Held (AP Motion) Tue 05/06 11:32 AM
Hearing Held. Motion GRANTED. Revised Order as discussed on the record to be submitted. Telephonic Appearances: Grayson Walter, Attorney for debtor, Ilan Scharf, Attorney for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Annette Rolain, Attorney for Fire State Insurance Company, Catalina Sugayan, Jeff Kahane, Attorneys for London Market Insurers and Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's London, Matthew Roberts, Attorney for Interstate Fire and Casualty Company and National Surety Corporation, Mark Bruh, Erin Champion, Office of US Trustee. (TEXT ONLY EVENT) Related [+]. (Folwell, T.)
Related: [-] related document(s)268 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff The Diocese of Rochester
Saturday, May 03, 2025
274 274 misc Document - CALL THE COURT BEFORE USING THIS Sat 05/03 7:29 AM
Document. Supplement to Motion Approving Form and Manner of Notice of Diocese's Motion to Approve Proposed Insurance Settlements and Setting Hearings and Objection Deadlines Related to Same Filed on behalf of Plaintiff The Diocese of Rochester. Related [+] Filed by Attorney (Walter, Grayson)
Related: [-] 266 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019, Motion for Sale of Property
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
273 273 utility Utility - Add AUST to case(batch) Wed 04/30 12:53 PM
Erin Champion, AUST, added to the case. (TEXT ONLY EVENT) (Czaja, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
272 272 claims Certificate of Service (FOR CLAIMS/NOTICING AGENTS ONLY) Tue 04/29 6:48 PM
Certificate of Service re: Notice of Motion for Entry of na Order Approving the Form and Manner of Notice of Motion to Approve Proposed Insurance Settlement Agreements and Policy Buy-Backs (Docket No. 268). Filed by Claims Agent Filed by Other Professional Stretto. (Vandell, Travis)
Related: [-]