Minnesota District Court
Judge:David T Schultz
Case #: 0:19-cv-02542
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause42:0405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2019
Re-opened:May 31, 2023
Terminated:Feb 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 15, 2020 5:39 AM CDT
Defendant
Andrew M. Saul
Represented By
Elvi Jenkins
Social Security Administration
contact info
Interested Party
SSA - Dallas Office
Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel, Region VI Room A-702 1301 Young Street
Dallas, TX 75202
Plaintiff
Brian T. Dahle
Represented By
David L Christianson
Christianson Law
contact info
Wes Kappelman
Kappelman Law Firm
contact info

GPO Jan 20 2022
ORDER granting 13 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Brian T. Dahle; denying 15 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Andrew M. Saul. (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/20/2022. (NEM)

Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 23, 2024
103 103 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Thu 05/23 4:51 PM
ORDER granting100 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 5/23/2024. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
102 102 respm Response Tue 05/21 6:55 AM
RESPONSE re100 MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA filed by Martin J. O'Malley.(Sides, James)
Related: [-]