Original Case: 0:19-cv-02542

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-01601
Typecivil / united states as a party
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2022
Terminated:Mar 07, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 09, 2023 2:29 AM CST
Defendant - Appellant
Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By
Elvi D. Jenkins
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
contact info
Joshua Marc Salzman
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Quinn Hochhalter
U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
Ann M. Bildtsen
U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
Quinn Askew
U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
Mark B. Stern
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Ana H. Voss
U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
Michael Allen Moss
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
contact info
Chetan Patil
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Brian T. Dahle
Represented By
Mahesha P. Subbaraman
SUBBARAMAN, PLLC
contact info
David L. Christianson
CHRISTIANSON LAW
contact info
Wes Kappelman
KAPPELMAN LAW FIRM
contact info

GPO Mar 07 2023
OPINION FILED - THE COURT: James B. Loken, Michael J. Melloy and Jonathan A. Kobes
AUTHORING JUDGE:Michael J. Melloy (PUBLISHED) [5252226] [22-1601]

Docket last updated: 03/09/2023 2:29 AM CST
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
RECORD FILED - MOTION TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: District Court document #72 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 09/30/2021, No. of Pgs.: 43, Court Reporter: Bebault, Carla R
[5139383] 22-1601 (STL)
Related: [-]
Civil case docketed. [5139320] 22-1601 (ASL)
Related: [-]
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order of 1/20/2022, Judgment of 1/21/2022, and docket entries, [5139330] 22-1601 (ASL)
Related: [-]
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Administrative Record due 05/02/2022. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Kilolo Kijakazi due 05/02/2022.. Appendix due on 05/02/2022
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[5139335] 22-1601 (ASL)
Related: [-]
APPEARANCE filed by Joshua M. Salzman for Appellant Ms. Kilolo Kijakazi w/service 03/22/2022 [5139362] 22-1601 (JMS)
Related: [-]