Morgan v. Denison Police Department et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Amos L Mazzant, III |
Referred: | Amos L Mazzant |
Case #: | 4:14-cv-00151 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2014 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 10, 2014 11:31 PM CST |
Defendant
Denison Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Adron Douglas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jared Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Lamont Morgan
930 West Shepherd
Denison, TX 75020 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 10, 2015 | ||
65 | 65
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 09/10 1:33 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to62 Notice of Appeal filed by David Lamont Morgan (pad, ) |