Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:19-bk-12122
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2019
Terminated:Mar 21, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of CreditorsOver 100,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Forever 21, Inc.
3880 N Mission Rd
Los Angeles, CA 90031-3138
Represented By
Laura Davis Jones
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Juliet M. Sarkessian
U.S. Trustee'S Office
contact info


1. Forever 21 Cancels Auction to Sell to Brookfield, Simon (therealdeal.com)
Submitted Tue 02/11/2020
2. Forever 21 files for bankruptcy protection (bbc.com)
Submitted Mon 09/30/2019
Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 03/21 9:28 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]