Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-12122

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:19-bk-12129
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2019
Terminated:Mar 01, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of CreditorsOver 100,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Riley Rose, LLC
3880 N Mission Rd
Los Angeles, CA 90031-3138
Represented By
Laura Davis Jones
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
11 11 6 pgs order Order Wed 03/01 8:52 AM
Order (I) Dismissing the Remaining Chapter 11 Case, (II) Authorizing the Dissolution of the Remaining Debtor, and (III) Granting Related Relief. Order Signed on 3/1/2023. (LAM)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 03/01 8:53 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
10 10 crditcrd none Fri 08/28 1:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Transfer/Assignment of Claim 19-12129 MFW) [claims,trclm] ( 25.00). Receipt Number 9937557, amount $ 25.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
9 9 claims Transfer/Assignment of Claim Fri 08/28 1:10 PM
Transfer/Assignment of Claim. Fee Amount $25 Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: TheYEON Co., Ltd To Korea Trade Insurance Corporation. Filed by Korea Trade Insurance Corporation. (Olson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
8 8 court Case Reassigned Tue 02/18 2:50 PM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin Gross Terminated (SH)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2020
7 7 claims Withdrawal of Claim Fri 01/24 12:36 PM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): claim #14 with claims agent in the amount of $2,849.17 . Filed by City of Frisco. (Weller, Helen)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 16, 2019
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Sat 11/16 12:07 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. of Riley Rose, LLC Filed by Riley Rose, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Sat 11/16 12:06 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. of Riley Rose, LLC Filed by Riley Rose, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2019
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 10/01 2:38 PM
Order Authorizing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An Order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Forever 21, Inc., Case No. 19-12122 Alameda Holdings, LLC, Case No. 19-12123 Forever 21 International Holdings, Inc., Case No. 19-12124 Forever 21 Logistics, LLC, Case No. 19-12125 Forever 21 Real Estate Holdings, LLC, Case No. 19-12126 Forever 21 Retail, Inc., Case No. 19-12127 Innovative Brand Partners, LLC, Case No. 19-12128 and Riley Rose, LLC, Case No. 19-12129 All further pleadings and other papers in such cases shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Forever 21, Inc., Case No. 19-12122 KG). Signed on 10/1/2019 (LMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2019
3 3 notice Appearance - Notice Mon 09/30 12:25 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Bexar County. (Stecker, Don)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 09/30 7:48 AM
Judge Kevin Gross added to case (LB)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 29, 2019
2 2 crditcrd none Sun 09/29 9:57 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-12129 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9470536, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 31 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 09/29 9:20 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Riley Rose, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Creditor Matrix