South Carolina Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David M Warren
Case #: 7:19-bk-05161
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2019
Creditor Meeting:Nov 04, 2019

Debtor
Labsource, LLC
PO Box 26809
Greenville, SC 29616-1809
Represented By
Frank James Guadagnino
Tower Two-Sixty
contact info
Andrew R Hand
Willoughby & Hoefer, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
John K Fort
John K Fort, Chapter 7 Trustee PO Box 669 29356
Landrum, SC 29356
Represented By
Chelsea Jaqueline Clark
Bruner Powell Wall & Mullins, LLC
contact info
Benjamin C. Bruner
Bruner, Powell, Wall & Mullins, LLC
contact info
Warren C. Powell, Jr
Bruner, Powell, Wall & Mullins, LLC
contact info
Joshua J Hudson
Smith Hudson Law, LLC
contact info
James Keane Mossman
Bruner, Powell, Wall, And Mullins, LLC
contact info
John K Fort
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee's Office
Strom Thurmond Federal Building 1835 Assembly St. Suite 953
Columbia, SC 29201
Represented By
Linda Barr
Office Of United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/31/2024 9:36 AM EDT
Thursday, September 19, 2019
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition - Transferred Case Tue 10/01 3:43 PM
Voluntary Petition re: Transferred Case from Western District of North Carolina originally filed on 09/19/2019. Filed by Labsource, LLC . (Richardson, R)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Receipt for Case Transfer Tue 10/01 3:48 PM
Receipt of Case Transferred from Western District of North Carolina. Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 7 19-31287 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt number 8549893, amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Richardson, R)
Related: [-]