Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:19-bk-05161

South Carolina Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Helen E Burris
Case #: 7:21-ap-80059
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2021
Terminated:Jan 12, 2024

Debtor
Labsource, LLC
P. O. Box 26809
Greenville, SC 29616
Represented By
Labsource, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Defendant
Aaron Kibbey, individually and as Chief Restructuring Officer of Oaktree Medical Centre, PC
Represented By
Aaron Kibbey
contact info
Defendant
Timothy Daileader, individually and as Independent Director of Oaktree Medical Centre, PC
Represented By
Timothy Daileader
contact info
Defendant
Huron Consulting Services, LLC, aka Huron Consulting Group
Represented By
Huron Consulting Services, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Mark Freedlander
Represented By
Mark Freedlander
contact info
Defendant
David Pivnick
Represented By
David Pivnick
contact info
Defendant
McGuireWoods LLP
101 West Main Street Suite 9000
Norfolk, VA 23510
Represented By
McGuireWoods LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John K. Fort, Trustee
PO Box 813
Drayton, SC 29333
Represented By
Joshua J Hudson
Smith Hudson Law, LLC
contact info
Trustee
John K Fort
PO Box 789
Drayton, SC 29333

GPO Apr 19 2022
Order Granting In Part, Denying In Part The Motion To Dismiss Filed By McGuirewoods LLP, Mark Freelander, & David Pivnick. Document Served (related document(s)51, 65, 46, 39). (McAbee, B)
GPO Apr 19 2022
Order Regarding Motion To Dismiss Filed By Huron Consulting Services, LLC & Aaron Kibbey. Document Served (related document(s)38, 37, 66, 47, 59, 52). (McAbee, B)

Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, January 12, 2024
276 276 court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/12 4:47 PM
Adversary Case Closed. (Stalvey, N)
Related: [-]
275 275 utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 01/12 4:45 PM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 21-80059 Dismissed Complaint. (Stalvey, N)
Related: [-]
274 274 order District Court Order Fri 01/12 4:43 PM
Order of Dismissal from District Court Re: Withdrawal of Reference. Related [+]. (Stalvey, N)
Related: [-] 233