Narrative Ark Entertainment LL v. Archie Comic Publications, Inc, et al
Original Case: 7:16-cv-06109
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-03114 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 22, 2020 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 24, 2020 3:43 AM EST |
Defendant
Sega of America, Inc.
|
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
Archie Comic Publications, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellant
Narrative Ark Entertainment LLC
|
Represented By
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Scott D. Fulop
|
Docket last updated: 01/24/2020 3:34 AM EST |
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Narrative Ark Entertainment LLC, FILED. [2667660] 19-3114 [Entered: 09/30/2019 11:06 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 19 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 16 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 08/29/2019, RECEIVED.[2667664] 19-3114 [Entered: 09/30/2019 11:08 AM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT CLERK'S JUDGMENT, dated 08/30/2019, RECEIVED.[2667669] 19-3114 [Entered: 09/30/2019 11:09 AM] | |
4 | 4 2 pgs PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Narrative Ark Entertainment LLC, district court receipt # ANYSDC-17678834, FILED.[2667671] 19-3114 [Entered: 09/30/2019 11:09 AM] |