Kane v. Signature Flight Support Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01078
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01078
Hawaii Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert J Faris |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-90034 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Oct 09, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 27, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Signature Flight Support Corporation, dba Signature Flight Support
Its Registered Agent 251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth A. Kane
P.O. Box 1573
Honolulu, HI 96806 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM HST |
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation
Wed 01/27 2:59 PM
Stipulation By and Between Elizabeth A. Kane and Defendant Signature Flight Support Corporation of Dismissal With Prejudice . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 01/27 3:27 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (A.P. No. 1:19-ap-90034). (DM) |
||
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
audio
Tue 12/01 1:50 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/1/2020 9:45:04 AM ]. File Size [ 1064 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:13 ]. (admin) |
|
18 | 18
court
Minutes - Continued (CHAP USE ONLY)
Tue 12/01 12:48 PM
Minutes of Status Conference held on 12/01/2020. Disposition: Status Conference is continued to 02/05/2021 at 10:00 AM. Appearances by telephone: Elaine T. Chow (Elizabeth A. Kane), and Allison A. Ito (Signature Flight Support Corporation). |
|
Thursday, October 22, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
notice
BNC Notice - Generic (w/ Text Box)
Thu 10/22 10:56 AM
Clerk's Notice: In consideration of the Order Granting Trustees Motion for Order Approving Settlement Agreement Respecting Preferential Transfer Claim with Signature Flight Support Corporation, entered October 13, 2020, in Case No. 17-01078 the trial in this matter scheduled to commence at 9:30 a.m. on December 1, 2020, is converted to a status conference. (MBD) |
|
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/08 4:29 PM
Certificate of Service regarding Plaintiff Elizabeth A. Kane's Second Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Signature Flight Corporation, dated March 23, 2020 . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 01/23 3:47 PM
Certificate of Service regarding Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, dated January 15, 2020 . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 01/16 2:48 PM
Certificate of Service (Defendant's Initial Disclosures) . Filed by Allison A. Ito. (Ito, Allison) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
order
Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 01/10 4:39 PM
[The entire order in this matter is set forth in this docket entry. No document is attached.] Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/10 4:16 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Signature Flight Support Corporation. (Ito, Allison) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (Motion) (ASSESSMENT - 300)
Fri 01/10 10:44 AM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Applicant: Steven J. Solomon) . Assessment Amount $ 300. (Choi, Chuck) |
|
crditcrd
none
Fri 01/10 10:45 AM
Receipt of filing fee for11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 19-90034 [motion,mot160] ( 300.00). Receipt No. 2844351. Fee amount $ 300.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 01/02 4:30 PM
Certificate of Service regarding Plaintiff Elizabeth A. Kane's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Signature Flight Support [dated January 2, 2020]; Exhibit "1" . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
court
[CerDocTyp]Scheduling Order in an Adversary Proceeding
Wed 12/18 7:31 PM
Scheduling Order in an Adversary Proceeding; BNC Certificate of Service Notice Date 12/18/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
court
Minutes - Scheduling Conference (VIRTUAL)
Mon 12/16 11:12 AM
Scheduling Order and Minutes of Scheduling Conference held on: 12/13/2019. Trial is scheduled for 12/1/2020 at 09:30 AM Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813 Appearances: Elaine T. Chow (Kane) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
audio
Fri 12/13 5:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/13/2019 2:03:25 AM ]. File Size [ 240 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:00 ]. (admin) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 12/09 9:42 AM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. . (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Scheduling Conference Statement
Fri 12/06 3:46 PM
Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff . Filed by Elaine T. Chow on behalf of Elizabeth A. Kane. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/05 10:48 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers; Certificate of Service, . Filed by Signature Flight Support Corporation. (Solomon, Steven) Modified on 11/5/2019 (LL) |
|
Wednesday, October 16, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 10/16 1:25 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. . (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Monday, October 14, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons (AP)
Mon 10/14 2:05 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding - Summons Issued on: Signature Flight Support Corporation. Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Wednesday, October 09, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/09 10:20 AM
Adversary case 19-90034 ADVERSARY PROCEEDING OPENED. 12 : Complaint by Elizabeth A. Kane against Signature Flight Support Corporation. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Chow, Elaine) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |