Kane v. NextRoll, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01078
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01078
Hawaii Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert J Faris |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-90037 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Oct 09, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 03, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
NextRoll, Inc., dba AdRoll Group
Its Registered Agent 251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth A. Kane
P.O. Box 1573
Honolulu, HI 96806 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM HST |
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
Tue 03/03 10:26 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Elaine T. Chow on behalf of Elizabeth A. Kane. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 03/03 10:45 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (A.P. No. 1:19-ap-90037). (DM) |
||
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 01/23 3:49 PM
Certificate of Service regarding Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, dated January 15, 2020 . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
court
[CerDocTyp]Scheduling Order in an Adversary Proceeding
Wed 12/18 7:31 PM
Scheduling Order in an Adversary Proceeding; BNC Certificate of Service Notice Date 12/18/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
Minutes - Scheduling Conference (VIRTUAL)
Mon 12/16 11:18 AM
Scheduling Order and Minutes of Scheduling Conference held on: 12/13/2019. Trial is scheduled for 12/1/2020 at 09:30 AM Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813. Appearance: Elaine T. Chow (Kane) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
audio
Fri 12/13 5:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/13/2019 2:07:39 AM ]. File Size [ 132 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:33 ]. (admin) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 12/09 9:49 AM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. . (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Scheduling Conference Statement
Fri 12/06 2:28 PM
Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff . Filed by Elaine T. Chow on behalf of Elizabeth A. Kane. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Wednesday, October 16, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 10/16 1:29 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. . (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Monday, October 14, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons (AP)
Mon 10/14 2:09 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding - Summons Issued on: NextRoll, Inc.. Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Wednesday, October 09, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/09 11:46 AM
Adversary case 19-90037 ADVERSARY PROCEEDING OPENED. 12 : Complaint by Elizabeth A. Kane against NextRoll, Inc.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Chow, Elaine) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |