Kane v. Mentair Group Pro, L.L.C.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01078
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01078
Hawaii Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert J Faris |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-90040 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Oct 09, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 04, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Mentair Group Pro, L.L.C.
Its Registered Agent 9712 N 151st Street
Bennington, NE 68007 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth A. Kane
P.O. Box 1573
Honolulu, HI 96806 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM HST |
Thursday, February 04, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation
Thu 02/04 2:18 PM
Stipulation By and Between Elizabeth A. Kane and Defendant Mentair Group Pro, L.L.C. of Dismissal Without Prejudice . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 02/04 2:21 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (A.P. No. 1:19-ap-90040). (DM) |
||
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 05/27 4:30 PM
Certificate of Service Mentair Group Pro, L.L.C.'s Initial Disclosures and First Set Of Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production of Documents . Filed by Allison A. Ito. (Ito, Allison) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 05/26 2:16 PM
Amended Certificate of Service regarding Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, dated May 22, 2020 . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Monday, May 25, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 05/25 5:04 PM
Certificate of Service regarding Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, dated May 22, 2020 . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
court
Minutes - Scheduling Conference (VIRTUAL)
Wed 05/06 9:16 AM
Minutes of Scheduling Conference held on: 04/24/2020. Disposition: Trial is set for 07/06/2021 at 9:30 A.M., with 120 day provision for motion to strike jury demand from date of scheduling conference. Appearances: Elaine T. Chow (Kane), Allison Ito and Daniel P. Yeomans (Mentair Group Pro, LLC) |
|
Sunday, April 26, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
court
[CerDocTyp] BNC All Purpose
Sun 04/26 6:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Service Notice Date 04/26/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 24, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
audio
Fri 04/24 7:50 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/24/2020 2:19:40 PM ]. File Size [ 496 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:02 ]. (admin) |
|
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order [CASE ADMIN USE]
Fri 04/24 5:19 PM
Scheduling Order. Trial is scheduled for 7/6/2021 at 09:30 AM Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813 Date of Entry: 4/24/2020. (MBD) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 03/23 1:09 PM
Certificate of Service (Mentair Group Pro, L.L.C.'s Response to Trustee's First Request for Production of Documents) . Filed by Allison A. Ito. (Ito, Allison) |
|
Wednesday, January 08, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 01/08 11:33 AM
Certificate of Service regarding Plaintiff Elizabeth A. Kane's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Mentair Group Pro, L.L.C. [dated January 6, 2020]; Exhibit "1" . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
court
Minutes - Continued (CHAP USE ONLY)
Tue 12/17 11:53 AM
Minutes of Scheduling Conference held on 12/13/2019. Disposition: Scheduling conference is continued to 04/24/2020 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813. Appearances: Elaine T. Chow (Kane), Allison A. Ito and Daniel P. Yeomans (telephone appearance) (Mentair Group Pro, LLC). |
|
12 | 12
audio
Fri 12/13 5:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/13/2019 2:09:47 AM ]. File Size [ 184 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:46 ]. (admin) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 12/09 9:52 AM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. . (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Saturday, December 07, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Scheduling Conference Statement
Sat 12/07 9:27 AM
Scheduling Conference Statement [Defendant's Scheduling Conference Statement] . Filed by Allison A. Ito on behalf of Mentair Group Pro, L.L.C.. (Ito, Allison) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Scheduling Conference Statement
Fri 12/06 2:32 PM
Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff . Filed by Elaine T. Chow on behalf of Elizabeth A. Kane. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 12/04 5:40 PM
Certificate of Service ; and Exhibit "A" . Filed by Allison A. Ito. . (Ito, Allison) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 12/03 3:35 PM
[The entire order in this matter is set forth in this docket entry. No document is attached.] Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice |
|
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (Motion) (ASSESSMENT - 300)
Tue 12/03 10:53 AM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Applicant: Daniel P. Yeomans) . Assessment Amount $ 300. (Ito, Allison) |
|
crditcrd
none
Tue 12/03 10:54 AM
Receipt of filing fee for6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 19-90040 [motion,mot160] ( 300.00). Receipt No. 2824773. Fee amount $ 300.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 11/27 12:35 PM
Certificate of Service ; and Exhibit "A" . Filed by Allison A. Ito. . (Ito, Allison) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 11/27 9:48 AM
Answer to Complaint ; and Jury Trial Demanded Filed by Mentair Group Pro, L.L.C.. (Ito, Allison) |
|
Wednesday, October 16, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 10/16 1:33 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. . (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Monday, October 14, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons (AP)
Mon 10/14 2:12 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding - Summons Issued on: Mentair Group Pro, L.L.C.. Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Wednesday, October 09, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/09 1:58 PM
Adversary case 19-90040 ADVERSARY PROCEEDING OPENED. 12 : Complaint by Elizabeth A. Kane against Mentair Group Pro, L.L.C.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Chow, Elaine) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |