Kane v. ReadyJet, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01078
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01078
Hawaii Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert J Faris |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-90041 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Oct 09, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 03, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ReadyJet, Inc.
Its Registered Agent 850 New Burton Road, Suite 201
Dover, DE 19904 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth A. Kane
P.O. Box 1573
Honolulu, HI 96806 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM HST |
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
Tue 03/03 10:29 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Elaine T. Chow on behalf of Elizabeth A. Kane. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 03/03 10:47 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (A.P. No. 1:19-ap-90041). (DM) |
||
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 01/23 3:50 PM
Certificate of Service regarding Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, dated January 15, 2020 . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
[CerDocTyp]Scheduling Order in an Adversary Proceeding
Wed 12/18 7:31 PM
Scheduling Order in an Adversary Proceeding; BNC Certificate of Service Notice Date 12/18/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
court
Minutes - Scheduling Conference (VIRTUAL)
Mon 12/16 11:21 AM
Scheduling Order and Minutes of Scheduling Conference held on: 12/13/2019. Trial is scheduled for 12/1/2020 at 09:30 AM Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813. Appearance: Elaine T. Chow (Kane) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
audio
Fri 12/13 5:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/13/2019 2:10:34 AM ]. File Size [ 124 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:31 ]. (admin) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 12/09 9:54 AM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. . (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Scheduling Conference Statement
Fri 12/06 2:33 PM
Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff . Filed by Elaine T. Chow on behalf of Elizabeth A. Kane. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 10/31 3:08 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. . (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Wednesday, October 23, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons (AP)
Wed 10/23 5:20 PM
Amended Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding - Summons Issued on: ReadyJet, Inc.. Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 10/23 2:46 PM
Amended Complaint First Amended Complaint by Elizabeth A. Kane against ReadyJet, Inc. . (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Wednesday, October 16, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 10/16 1:34 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Elaine T. Chow. . (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Monday, October 14, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons (AP)
Mon 10/14 2:13 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding - Summons Issued on: ReadyJet, Inc.. Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom, 1132 Bishop Street, Suite 250, Honolulu, HI 96813. (Chow, Elaine) |
|
Wednesday, October 09, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/09 2:09 PM
Adversary case 19-90041 ADVERSARY PROCEEDING OPENED. 12 : Complaint by Elizabeth A. Kane against ReadyJet, Inc.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Chow, Elaine) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |