Kane v. Oshiro
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01078
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01078
Hawaii Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert J Faris |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-90048 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Oct 10, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Richard Oshiro
520 Lunalilo Home Road, #6133
Honolulu, HI 96825 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth A. Kane
P.O. Box 1573
Honolulu, HI 96806 |
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 29 2021
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (related document(s)1 Complaint). Date of Entry: 12/29/2020. (LL) |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM HST |
Friday, July 16, 2021 | ||
87 | 87
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Fri 07/16 9:22 AM
Satisfaction of Judgment dated January 8, 2021 Against Defendant Richard Oshiro Pursuant to the Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, Entered on December 29, 2020, Filed on January 8, 2021 . Filed by Elaine T. Chow on behalf of Elizabeth A. Kane. (Chow, Elaine). Modified on 7/16/2021 [Clerk's Note: Added relation to Dkt #81 .] (DM) |