Kane v. PaCap Aviation Finance, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01078
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01078
Hawaii Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert J Faris |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-90049 |
Nature of Suit | 81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest 2 Bankruptcy - Other 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Oct 11, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
PaCap Aviation Finance, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pacap Management Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pacificap Investment Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Malama Investments, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Snowbiz Ventures, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PaCap Management Solutions, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PaCap Advisors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffrey Au
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jack Chuck She Tsui Trust, also known as the Jack Cheuk She Tsui Revocable Living Trust
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jack Tsui
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lawrence Investments, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lawrence J. Ellison Revocable Trust, Dated January 22, 1988, As Amended
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ohana Airline Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carbonview Limited, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth A. Kane
P.O. Box 1573
Honolulu, HI 96806 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM HST |
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
273 | 273
notice
Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation (PDF Not Required - Reserved for KP)
Thu 01/19 11:24 AM
Attorney's Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation. Notice is hereby given that effective January 3, 2023, Simon Klevansky will be associated with Chun Kerr, LLP and will continue representation of the party in this case. Notice and documents should now be sent to Simon Klevansky at 999 Bishop Street, Suite 2100, Honolulu, HI 96813-4443. . (Klevansky, Simon) |
|
272 | 272
notice
Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation (PDF Not Required - Reserved for KP)
Thu 01/19 11:18 AM
Attorney's Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation. Notice is hereby given that effective January 3, 2023, Alika L. Piper will be associated with Chun Kerr, LLP and will continue representation of the party in this case. Notice and documents should now be sent to Alika L. Piper at 999 Bishop Street, Suite 2100, Honolulu, HI 96813-4443. . (Piper, Alika) |