Dura Automotive Systems, LLC
Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Randal S Mashburn |
Case #: | 3:19-bk-06741 |
Case Filed: | Oct 17, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 12, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Dura Automotive Systems, LLC
1780 Pond Run
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2752 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE 701 BROADWAY STE 318
NASHVILLE, TN 37203 |
1. | Financier puts profitable Dura into bankruptcy in high-wire move to shed obligations (crainsdetroit.com) |
Submitted Fri 10/18/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
257 | 257
order
Final Decree Chapter 11
Thu 12/12 9:32 AM
Final Decree Issued. Chapter 11 case is closed. IT IS ORDERED that the trustee, if one was appointed, is discharged as trustee of this estate. Signed on 12/12/2019. (jlm) |