Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-12269

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:19-bk-12273
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2019
Terminated:Mar 29, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,000,001 to $50 billion
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Olam Energy Resources I LLC
280 E 96th St Ste 210
Indianapolis, IN 46240-3853
Represented By
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago
Thursday, March 31, 2022
21 21 claims Claims Register Thu 03/31 8:51 PM
Final Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 03/29 1:01 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (JS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
20 20 order Final Decree Mon 03/28 4:16 PM
Order (I) Entering a Final Decree Closing the Bankruptcy Cases; (II) Authorizing the Abandonment of Remaining Books and Records and Other Property; and (III) Granting Related Relief. Signed on 3/28/2022 (NAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
19 19 claims Claims Register Fri 01/07 5:27 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
18 18 claims Claims Register Wed 10/06 3:30 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
17 17 claims Claims Register Tue 07/20 2:08 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
16 16 claims Claims Register Mon 04/26 7:43 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
15 15 court Case Reassigned Mon 04/26 4:36 PM
Order Reassigning Case. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2020
14 14 claims Claims Register Fri 07/31 11:18 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
13 13 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 01/15 10:19 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Olam Energy Resources I LLC. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 01/15 10:18 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Olam Energy Resources I LLC. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2019
11 11 court Case Reassigned Mon 12/16 10:30 AM
Order of Reassignment. Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case. Involvement of Judge Karen B. Owens Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2019
10 10 notice Withdrawal of Document - Notice Fri 11/15 8:33 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases (D.I. 6) Related [+] Filed by Olam Energy Resources I LLC. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 6
9 9 order Order-Joint Admin Fri 11/15 3:02 PM
Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of MTE Holdings LLC, Case No. 19-12269 (KBO) for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in the chapter 11 case of MTE Holdings LLC, Case No. 19-12269 (KBO), should be consulted for all matters concerning this case. Signed on 11/15/2019 (Mml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2019
8 8 court VAN-472 Notice to Counsel Re: 341 Meeting Thu 11/07 11:01 AM
Notice to Counsel Regarding Scheduling of 341 Meeting Related [+] (AJL)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
7 7 misc Request to Schedule Section 341 Meeting Wed 11/06 12:58 PM
Request of US Trustee to Schedule Section 341 Meeting of Creditors on Thursday, December 5, 2019 at 2:00 p.m., at the J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building; 844 King Street; 3rd Floor, Room 3209; Wilmington, DE 19801 Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Casey, Linda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
6 6 motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Tue 11/05 11:37 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC, Olam Energy Resources I LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/5/2019 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/19/2019. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 26, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/27 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 10/26/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3
Friday, October 25, 2019
4 4 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Fri 10/25 6:07 PM
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors , Corporate Ownership Statement, List of Equity Security Holders and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Olam Energy Resources I LLC. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2019
3 3 court VAN-313 Notice Regarding Deficient Filings Thu 10/24 11:32 AM
Notice Regarding Deficient Filings. Deficiency Due Date: Incomplete Filings due by 10/28/2019. (SH)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 10/24 10:30 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-12273 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9500272, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Thu 10/24 7:35 AM
Judge Karen B. Owens added to case (LB)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Thu 10/24 9:42 AM
Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Casey, Linda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
1 1 10 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 10/23 11:38 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Olam Energy Resources I LLC. (Dehney, Robert)
Related: [-]