Joint Admin
|
1:19-bk-12273 - Olam Energy Resources I LLC
|
10/23/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
1:19-bk-12272 - MTE Partners LLC
|
10/23/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
1:19-bk-12385 - MDC Energy LLC
|
11/08/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
1:19-bk-12386 - Ward I, LLC
|
11/08/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
1:19-bk-12387 - MDC Texas Operator LLC
|
11/08/2019
|
Joint Admin
|
1:19-bk-12388 - MDC Reeves Energy LLC
|
11/08/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-50792 - Riverstone Credit Management, LLC et al v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
11/12/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50553 - Pilot Thomas Logistics, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
03/30/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50592 - Alamo Pressure Pumping, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
04/28/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50635 - Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, LLC et al v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/01/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50634 - Fulcrum Credit Partners, LLC v. MDC Energy, LLC et al
|
07/01/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50633 - Cretic Energy Services, LLC v. MDC Texas Energy, LLC et al
|
07/01/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50632 - Eastham Drilling, Inc. v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/01/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50660 - Globe Chemical, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50665 - Centennial Resource Production, LLC v. MDC ENERGY LLC, d/b/a MDC TEXAS ENERGY LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50661 - McClinton Energy Group, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50662 - Flowco Production Solutions, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50663 - Sidewinder Drilling, LLC v. MDC ENERGY LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50664 - Gravity Oilfield Services, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50666 - Knight Oil Tools, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50667 - Patterson-UTI Drilling Company, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50668 - Peak Oilfield Services, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50669 - Pumpco Energy Services, Inc. v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50670 - Repeat Precision, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50671 - Select Energy Services, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50672 - SOLARIS OILFIELD SITE SERVICES OPERATING, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50673 - Russaw Transport, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50674 - Tetra Production Testing Services, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50675 - WaterBridge Texas Midstream LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50676 - TETRA Technologies, Inc. v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50677 - Texas Fueling Services Inc. v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50678 - L.P. et al v. MDC Energy, LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50679 - Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. v. MDC Energy, LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50680 - Sierra Hamilton LLC v. MDC Energy, LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50681 - Tri-State Oilfield Services, LLC v. MDC ENERGY LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50682 - STEP Energy Services Holdings Ltd v. MDC ENERGY LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50647 - Stellar Drilling Fluids, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50659 - Big B Crane, LLC v. MDC ENERGY LLC, d/b/a MDC TEXAS ENERGY LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50636 - TOPOGRAPHIC LAND SURVEYORS, CO. v. MDC ENERGY LLC, d/b/a MDC TEXAS ENERGY LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50637 - TriplePlay Transport, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50638 - TANMAR RENTALS LLC v. MDC ENERGY LLC, d/b/a MDC TEXAS ENERGY LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50639 - Meyer Energy Services, LLC v. MDC Texas Operator LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50640 - Nextier Completion Solutions Inc. f/k/a C&J Spec-R v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50641 - Alpha and Omega Sales & Consulting, Inc. v. MDC ENERGY LLC, d/b/a MDC TEXAS ENERGY LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50642 - Trans-Tex Cementing, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50643 - SitePro, Inc. v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50644 - Trans-Tex Dyno, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50645 - B&L Pipeco Services, Inc. v. MTE Holdings LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50646 - Reeves County Resources, LLC v. MDC Energy, LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50648 - Summit Casing Services, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50649 - Apergy ESP Systems LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50650 - Mulholland Energy Services LLC v. MDC ENERGY LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50651 - Axis Well Services LLC v. MDC ENERGY LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50652 - Baseline Energy Services, LP v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50653 - Basic Energy Services, LP v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50654 - Clean Chemistry, Inc. v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50655 - JW Powerline, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50656 - Connection Field Services, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50657 - Covenant Testing Technologies, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50658 - Legacy Directional Drilling, LLC v. MDC ENERGY LLC et al
|
07/02/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50814 - Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc. et al v. Tier One Energy, LLP et al
|
08/17/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-50815 - Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, LLC et al v. Alamo Pressure Pumping, LLC et al
|
08/17/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-51005 - Chenault-Vaughn Family Partnership, Ltd. v. MDC Reeves Energy LLC et al
|
11/11/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51256 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. 5J Oilfield Services, LLC
|
11/05/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51263 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. Wilbanks Trucking Services, LLC
|
11/05/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51262 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. United Casing Incorporated
|
11/05/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51261 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. Tier One Energy, LLP et al
|
11/05/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51260 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. Stealth Oilwell Services, LLC
|
11/05/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51259 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. NGL Water Solutions Permian, LLC
|
11/05/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51258 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. Iron Horse Tools, LLC et al
|
11/05/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51257 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. Firethorne Downhole
|
11/05/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51255 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. Siffin et al
|
11/05/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51254 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. Rock Tool Company
|
11/05/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51253 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. Stallion Oilfield Holdings, Inc.
|
11/05/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51252 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. Total Energy Solutions, LLC
|
11/05/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51251 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. Red Bone Services, LLC
|
11/05/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51250 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. Bond-Coat, Inc.
|
11/05/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51249 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. Permian Power Tong, LLC
|
11/05/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51248 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. Creek Pipe Company LLC
|
11/05/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51247 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. Aquarius Chemical, LLC
|
11/05/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51413 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. Sfunhiro Operations LLC
|
12/17/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51414 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. Spraberry Production Services, LLC
|
12/17/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51415 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. Wellbore Fishing & Rental Tools, LLC
|
12/20/2021
|
Adversary
|
1:21-ap-51416 - RPA Asset Management Services, LLC v. Chase Harris, Inc.
|
12/20/2021
|