Road Sprinkler Fitters Local v. CCR Fire Protection, L.L.C.
Original Case: 3:16-cv-00448
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-pcf-30886 |
Type | private civil federal / private |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Case Filed: | Oct 28, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 02, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 04, 2019 2:33 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
QUICK RESPONSE FIRE PROTECTION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ROAD SPRINKLERS FITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 669, U.A. AFL-CIO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ROAD SPRINKLER FITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 669, U.A. AFL-CIO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/04/2019 2:33 AM CST |
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Road Sprinkler Fitters Local Union No. 669, U.A. AFL-CIO. 19-30886 (SEP) |