Mon River Towing, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 2:19-bk-56885
Lead case is: 2:19-bk-56885
Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | John E Hoffman Jr |
Case #: | 2:19-bk-56948 |
Case Filed: | Oct 29, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 25,001-50,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Mon River Towing, Inc.
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Asst US Trustee (Col)
Office of the US Trustee 170 North High Street Suite 200
Columbus, OH 43215 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 7:00 PM EDT |
Friday, October 16, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice
Fri 10/16 12:33 PM
Notice of Application of Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp. T/A Capital One Equipment Leasing and Finance for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 503(b)(1)(A) Filed by Creditor Capital One, National Association . (Sylvester, Edward) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Administrative Expenses
Fri 10/16 12:27 PM
Application for Administrative Expenses Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 503(b)(1)(A) Filed by Creditor Capital One, National Association (Sylvester, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, December 14, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Sat 12/14 6:58 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor In Possession Mon River Towing, Inc.. (Lewis, Kim) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Schedules A-J
Sat 12/14 6:58 PM
Schedules A-J Filed by Debtor In Possession Mon River Towing, Inc.. (Lewis, Kim) |
|
Sunday, November 03, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
BNC
Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC
Sun 11/03 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 11/03/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
order
Joint Administration
Fri 11/01 2:24 PM
Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief on Lead Case 2:19-bk-56885 with Member Case 2:19-bk-56948 (2km) |
|
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Joint Administration
Wed 10/30 12:08 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor In Possession Mon River Towing, Inc. (Lewis, Kim) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 29, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
38
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 10/29 5:29 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Paid $1717 - Filing fee amount required is $1717.00 Filed by Mon River Towing, Inc.. (Lewis, Kim) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 10/29 2:31 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:19-bk-56948) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 37318158, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |