Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-30654

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:H Christopher Mott
Case #: 3:19-ap-03011
Nature of Suit64 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(15), divorce or separation obligation (other than domestic support)
61 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(5), domestic support
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2019
Terminated:May 27, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alexander Frank Catucci, Defendant
6305 Franklin Trail Dr.
El Paso, TX 79912
Represented By
Alexander Frank Catucci
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa A. Elizondo, Plaintiff
221 N. Kansas, Ste. 1700
El Paso, TX 79901
Represented By
James W. Brewer
Kemp Smith LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Wed 05/27 9:34 AM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Cardenas, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 01, 2020
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/01 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/01/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Agreed Judgment for Plaintiff (related document(s):12 Amended Complaint () filed by James W. Brewer for Plaintiff Lisa A. Elizondo (Brewer, James) (related document(s):1 Adversary case 19-03011 Complaint filed by Lisa A. Elizondo (attorney James W. Brewer) against Alexander Frank Catucci (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(61 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(5), domestic support)),(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet))) (Order entered on 4/29/2020)
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/01 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/01/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order Mooting (related document(s):14 Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by James W. Brewer for Plaintiff Lisa A. Elizondo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 4/29/2020)
Wednesday, April 29, 2020
18 18 order AP-Judgment (PDF) Wed 04/29 4:34 PM
Agreed Judgment for Plaintiff Related [+] (Order entered on 4/29/2020) (Cardenas, Rachel)
Related: [-] 12 Amended Complaint () filed by James W. Brewer for Plaintiff Lisa A. Elizondo (Brewer, James) (related document(s):1 Adversary case 19-03011 Complaint filed by Lisa A. Elizondo (attorney James W. Brewer) against Alexander Frank Catucci (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(61 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(5), domestic support)),(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet))
17 17 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Wed 04/29 4:30 PM
Order Mooting Related [+] (Order entered on 4/29/2020) (Cardenas, Rachel)
Related: [-] 14 Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by James W. Brewer for Plaintiff Lisa A. Elizondo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Proposed Order)
Monday, April 13, 2020
16 16 court Letter-Order Due (F) (Adversary) Mon 04/13 10:54 AM
Order Due Letter Sent to: Mr. Brewer Related [+] Overdue Order Due By 5/4/2020
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 19-03011 Complaint filed by Lisa A. Elizondo (attorney James W. Brewer) against Alexander Frank Catucci (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(61 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(5), domestic support)),(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)sendez, Laura
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
court Hearing Held (Adversary) Wed 03/25 3:50 PM
Hearing Held: AGREED JUDGMENT TO COME BY: JIM BREWER. . Related [+] Order due by 4/8/2020
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 19-03011 Complaint filed by Lisa A. Elizondo (attorney James W. Brewer) against Alexander Frank Catucci (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(61 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(5), domestic support)),(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)sendez, Laura
Thursday, March 19, 2020
15 15 misc Proposed Pre-Trial Order Thu 03/19 11:10 AM
Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order filed by James W. Brewer for Plaintiff Lisa A. Elizondo (Brewer, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2020
14 14 motion Summary Judgment (Adversary) Mon 03/02 2:39 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by James W. Brewer for Plaintiff Lisa A. Elizondo. (Brewer, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 06, 2020
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/06 9:58 AM
Amended Answer to First Amended Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt filed by Alexander Frank Catucci, (Miranda, Carlos). Related document(s)12 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Lisa A. Elizondo Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 19-03011 Complaint filed by Lisa A. Elizondo against Alexander Frank Catucci (Nature(s) of Suit:(61 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(5), domestic support),(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)
Monday, January 13, 2020
12 12 misc Amended Complaint Mon 01/13 12:33 PM
Amended Complaint () filed by James W. Brewer for Plaintiff Lisa A. Elizondo (Brewer, James) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 19-03011 Complaint filed by Lisa A. Elizondo (attorney James W. Brewer) against Alexander Frank Catucci (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(61 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(5), domestic support)),(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Friday, December 27, 2019
11 11 misc Statement Regarding Consent Fri 12/27 2:40 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by James W. Brewer for Plaintiff Lisa A. Elizondo (Brewer, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2019
10 10 misc Statement Regarding Consent Mon 12/23 10:34 AM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Carlos A. Miranda for Defendant Alexander Frank Catucci (Miranda, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 14, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/14 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/14/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 12/12/2019)
Thursday, December 12, 2019
8 8 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Thu 12/12 1:38 PM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 12/12/2019) Related [+]
Related: [-] sendez, Laura
Thursday, November 28, 2019
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/28 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 6 Scheduling Order (related document(s):1 Adversary case 19-03011 Complaint filed by Lisa A. Elizondo (attorney James W. Brewer) against Alexander Frank Catucci (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(61 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(5), domestic support)),(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree) Docket Call Set For 3/25/2020 at 02:00 PM at El Paso Courtroom, Discovery due 2/24/2020, Pre-Trial Order due by 3/18/2020, Dispositive Motions Due By 3/5/2020 (Order entered on 11/26/2019)) Notice Date 11/28/2019. (Admin.
Tuesday, November 26, 2019
6 6 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Tue 11/26 9:13 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 19-03011 Complaint filed by Lisa A. Elizondo (attorney James W. Brewer) against Alexander Frank Catucci (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(61 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(5), domestic support)),(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree) Docket Call Set For 3/25/2020 at 02:00 PM at El Paso Courtroom, Discovery due 2/24/2020, Pre-Trial Order due by 3/18/2020, Dispositive Motions Due By 3/5/2020 (Order entered on 11/26/2019) (Farrar, Ronda
Monday, November 25, 2019
5 5 answer Response Mon 11/25 11:17 AM
Response Filed by Carlos A. Miranda for Defendant Alexander Frank Catucci (Miranda, Carlos) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 19-03011 Complaint filed by Lisa A. Elizondo (attorney James W. Brewer) against Alexander Frank Catucci (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(61 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(5), domestic support)),(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
4 4 cmp Adversary Summons Served Wed 10/30 3:22 PM
Summons Served on Alexander Frank Catucci - served on 10/30/2019 (Brewer, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Request For Summons (Auto) Wed 10/30 3:03 PM
Summons Issued on Alexander Frank Catucci Answer Due 11/29/2019 (Brewer, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Wed 10/30 3:02 PM
Summons Issued on Alexander Frank Catucci Answer Due 11/29/2019 (Brewer, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/30 3:02 PM
Adversary case 19-03011 Complaint filed by Lisa A. Elizondo (attorney James W. Brewer) against Alexander Frank Catucci (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(61 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(5), domestic support)),(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree))). (Brewer, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet