Original Case: 2:14-cv-16744

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:19-cv.us-02208
Typecivil u.s. / united states
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2019
Last checked: Friday Nov 01, 2019 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
GINA MCCARTHY, in her official capacity as Administrator
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By
Sonya Shea
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
J. Christopher Krivonyak
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
contact info
Jennifer Maureen Mankins
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
contact info
Gary L. Call
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
contact info
Kent Edmund Hanson
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Stefania D. Shamet
ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
contact info
Laura J.S. Brown
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SCOTT PRUITT, in his official capacity as Administrator
Represented By
Sonya Shea
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
J. Christopher Krivonyak
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
contact info
Jennifer Maureen Mankins
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
contact info
Gary L. Call
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
contact info
Kent Edmund Hanson
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Stefania D. Shamet
ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
contact info
Laura J.S. Brown
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
RON FOSTER
Represented By
Joseph V. Schaeffer
SPILMAN, THOMAS & BATTLE, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
FOSTER FARMS, LLC
Represented By
Joseph V. Schaeffer
SPILMAN, THOMAS & BATTLE, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARKETING & PLANNING SPECIALISTS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By
Joseph V. Schaeffer
SPILMAN, THOMAS & BATTLE, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/01/2019 4:20 AM EDT
Thursday, October 31, 2019
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:14-cv-16744. Case manager: KHancock. 19-2208 KH [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:58 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 2:14-cv-16744. Mailed to: Laura J.S. Brown, Kent Edmund Hanson, Sonya Shea. 19-2208 KH [Entered: 10/31/2019 04:04 PM]
Related: [-]