West Virginia Southern District Court
Judge:John T Copenhaver, Jr
Case #: 2:14-cv-16744
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause33:1319 Clean Water Act
Case Filed:May 21, 2014
Terminated:Sep 27, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 16, 2014 6:06 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Gina McCarthy
Represented By
J. Christopher Krivonyak
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Amanda Shafer Berman
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Counter Defendant
Ron Foster
Represented By
John Charles Wilkinson, Jr.
Spilman Thomas & Battle
contact info
James S. Crockett, Jr.
Spilman Thomas & Battle
contact info
Counter Defendant
Foster Farms, LLC
Represented By
John Charles Wilkinson, Jr.
Spilman Thomas & Battle
contact info
James S. Crockett, Jr.
Spilman Thomas & Battle
contact info
Counter Defendant
Marketing & Planning Specialists Limited Partnership
Represented By
John Charles Wilkinson, Jr.
Spilman Thomas & Battle
contact info
James S. Crockett, Jr.
Spilman Thomas & Battle
contact info
Defendant
Gina McCarthy
Represented By
J. Christopher Krivonyak
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Amanda Shafer Berman
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Gary L. Call
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Ron Foster
Represented By
John Charles Wilkinson, Jr.
Spilman Thomas & Battle
contact info
James S. Crockett, Jr.
Spilman Thomas & Battle
contact info
Plaintiff
Foster Farms, LLC
Represented By
John Charles Wilkinson, Jr.
Spilman Thomas & Battle
contact info
James S. Crockett, Jr.
Spilman Thomas & Battle
contact info
Plaintiff
Marketing & Planning Specialists Limited Partnership
Represented By
John Charles Wilkinson, Jr.
Spilman Thomas & Battle
contact info
James S. Crockett, Jr.
Spilman Thomas & Battle
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Counter Claimant
United States Environmental Protection Agency
Terminated: 11/03/2014
Represented By
J. Christopher Krivonyak
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Amanda Shafer Berman
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States Environmental Protection Agency
Terminated: 11/03/2014
Represented By
J. Christopher Krivonyak
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Amanda Shafer Berman
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Gary L. Call
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
335 335 2 pgs order Order Of 4CCA Re: Miscellaneous Tue 04/22 11:32 AM
ORDER OF 4CCA as to327 Notice of Appeal to 4CCA in 4CCA Case No. 19-2208 Case held in abeyance until 8/15/2025. (kew)
Related: [-]