Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His C v. KCM Art, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-13228
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-13228
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01384 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 06, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
KCM Art, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.
|
Represented By
Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.
contact info |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, January 11, 2021 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 01/11 10:53 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1384 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Friday, January 08, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Fri 01/08 2:27 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Thursday, April 23, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
order
Motion, Approve
Thu 04/23 2:54 PM
Order Signed on 4/23/2020 Approving Settlement Agreement with KCM Art, Inc. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
Wednesday, April 22, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
Wed 04/22 2:44 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Certificate of No Objection to Trustees Application for Orders Approving Settlement Agreements with (A) American Express National Bank, successor by merger to American Express Bank, FSB, And (B) KCM Art, Inc. Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Thursday, April 02, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 04/02 3:57 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Proposed Orders Approving Settlement Agreements with (A) American Express National Bank, Successor by Merger to American Express Bank, FSB and (B) KCM Art, Inc. Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Motion, Approve
Wed 04/01 1:16 PM
Omnibus Motion to Approve /(Presentment Date: 4/20/2020 at 12:00 p.m., Objection Deadline: 4/20/2020 at 11:00 a.m.) Trustee's Application for Orders Approving Settlement Agreements with (A) American Express National Bank, successor by merger to American Express Bank, FSB, and (B) KCM Art, Inc. filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd. with hearing to be held on 4/20/2020 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 501 (RG) Responses due by 4/20/2020,. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: American Express Settlement Agreement | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: KCM Settlement Agreement (Exhibit A: Consent Judgment) | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3: Berger Declaration | ||
Att: 4 Pleading Notice of Presentment | ||
Thursday, March 26, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice, Hearing
Thu 03/26 1:25 PM
Notice of Hearing /(Hearing Date: 3/31/2020 at 10 a.m.) Notice of Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference (Ex 1: General Order M-543) with hearing to be held on 3/31/2020 (check with court for location) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation
Fri 03/20 11:15 AM
Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Monday, March 09, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation
Mon 03/09 4:15 PM
Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Wed 02/26 5:21 PM
Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 02/21 3:38 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference (Berger, Neil) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 02/21 9:48 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: 3/31/2020 @ 10:00 A.M.) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Tue 01/21 4:10 PM
Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 01/17 1:41 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 01/16 12:09 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: 2/19/2020 at 10 A.M.) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 2/19/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 01/06 11:40 AM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 01/02 6:22 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: To Be Determined) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, December 31, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Tue 12/31 11:21 AM
Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Wednesday, December 25, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 12/26 12:30 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 12/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 12/23 10:36 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil to Judge Robert E. Grossman. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Tue 12/03 5:42 PM
Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Tue 12/03 4:38 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Amelia Brankov on behalf of KCM Art, Inc.. (Brankov, Amelia) |
|
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 11/22 12:35 PM
Affidavit of Service of (I) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding; and (II) Complaint Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 11/15 3:48 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-01384 mkv] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 635. Fee amount 350.00. (Ortiz) |
||
Monday, November 11, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 11/11 2:03 PM
Affidavit of Service of (I) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding; and (II) Complaint (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, November 08, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 11/08 12:44 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MKV), Answer due by 12/9/2019, (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
|
Wednesday, November 06, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Wed 11/06 1:59 PM
Adversary case 19-01384 Complaint against KCM Art, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Ch 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Togut, Albert) (Filing Fee $350.00 Charged to the Estate, Receipt #635) Modified on 11/6/2019 (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Schedule of Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Schedule of Antecedent Debts |