Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His C v. Aryeh et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-13228
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-13228
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01391 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 07, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 17, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Benjamin Aryeh
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rafael Gallery, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, May 17, 2021 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 05/17 8:43 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1391 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Barrett, Chantel) |
||
Friday, May 14, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation
Fri 05/14 3:49 PM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceedings Against Defendants Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Sunday, February 28, 2021 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Sun 02/28 10:41 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Robert E. Grossman to Judge Lisa G. Beckerman. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
order
Motion, Approve
Mon 11/02 1:48 PM
So Ordered Stipulation Signed by the Honorable Shelley C. Chapman on 11/2/2020 Settling this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
Mon 10/26 9:06 AM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 /Certificate of No Objection to Trustee's Application for Order Approving Settlement Agreement with Benjamin Aryeh and Rafael Gallery, Inc. Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
claims
Certificate of Mailing of Claims Agent
Tue 10/13 8:45 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Claims Agent re: 1) Notice of Hearing to Consider Trustees Application for Order Approving Settlement Agreement with Benjamin Aryeh and Rafael Gallery, Inc.; and 2) Exhibit 1 Amended Settlement Agreement filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert) |
|
Thursday, October 08, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
ans
Statement
Thu 10/08 2:57 PM
Statement /Amended Exhibit 1: Settlement Agreement (Exhibit A: Consent Judgment) filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Motion, Approve
Thu 10/08 1:40 PM
Motion to Approve /(Hearing Date: 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM, Objection Deadline: 10/22/2020 at 4:00 PM) Trustee's Application for Order Approving Settlement Agreement with Benjamin Aryeh and Rafael Gallery, Inc. filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd. with hearing to be held on 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) Responses due by 10/22/2020,. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Settlement Agreement (Exhibit A: Consent Judgment) | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Berger Declaration | ||
Att: 3 Pleading Notice of Hearing | ||
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 09/15 3:14 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Tue 09/15 12:48 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference (Exhibit 1: General Order M-543) with hearing to be held on 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, August 21, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 08/21 3:04 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference (Exhibit 1: General Order M-543) with hearing to be held on 9/29/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, July 17, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 07/17 1:31 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: 8/25/2020 at 10:00 a.m.) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference (Exhibit 1: General Order M-543) with hearing to be held on 8/25/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Wednesday, June 17, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice, Hearing
Wed 06/17 5:53 PM
Notice of Hearing /(Hearing Date: 7/28/2020 @ 10:00 am, Objection Deadline: 7/21/2020 @ 4:00 pm) Notice of Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference (Exhibit 1: General Order M-543) with hearing to be held on 7/28/2020 (check with court for location) Objections due by 7/21/2020, (Berger, Neil) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice, Hearing
Mon 06/01 3:44 PM
Notice of Hearing /(Hearing Date: 6/16/2020 at 10:00 a.m.) Notice of Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference with hearing to be held on 6/16/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice, Hearing
Thu 03/26 1:25 PM
Notice of Hearing /(Hearing Date: 3/31/2020 at 10 a.m.) Notice of Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference (Ex 1: General Order M-543) with hearing to be held on 3/31/2020 (check with court for location) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 02/21 3:38 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference (Berger, Neil) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 02/21 9:59 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: 3/31/2020 @ 10:00 A.M.) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
answer
None
Fri 01/31 4:33 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Chester R. Ostrowski on behalf of Benjamin Aryeh, Rafael Gallery, Inc.. (Ostrowski, Chester) |
|
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Fri 01/17 4:34 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Chester R. Ostrowski on behalf of Benjamin Aryeh, Rafael Gallery, Inc.. (Ostrowski, Chester) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 01/17 1:56 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 01/16 11:50 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: 2/19/2020 at 10 A.M.) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 2/19/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
13 | 13
order
Motion, Substitute Attorney
Thu 01/16 10:45 AM
So Ordered Stipulation and Order of Substitution of Counsel Signed on 1/16/2020. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 01/06 11:52 AM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Fri 01/03 4:02 PM
Stipulation Extending Deadline to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 01/02 6:05 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (Adjourned Date: To Be Determined) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, December 27, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Motion, Substitute Attorney
Fri 12/27 10:24 AM
Motion to Substitute Attorney by Stipulation and Order filed by Chester R. Ostrowski on behalf of Benjamin Aryeh, Rafael Gallery, Inc.. (Ostrowski, Chester) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of B. Aryeh in Support | ||
Wednesday, December 25, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 12/26 12:30 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 12/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 12/23 10:36 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil to Judge Robert E. Grossman. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Tue 12/03 4:24 PM
Stipulation Extending Deadline to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Mon 12/02 8:42 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Scott Krinsky on behalf of Benjamin Aryeh, Rafael Gallery, Inc.. (Krinsky, Scott) |
|
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 11/22 11:47 AM
Affidavit of Service of (I) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding; and (II) Complaint Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 11/15 3:48 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-01391 mkv] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 635. Fee amount 350.00. (Ortiz) |
||
Monday, November 11, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 11/11 2:03 PM
Affidavit of Service of (I) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding; and (II) Complaint (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, November 08, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 11/08 1:14 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MKV), Answer due by 12/9/2019, (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Thu 11/07 1:39 PM
Adversary case 19-01391 Complaint against Benjamin Aryeh, Rafael Gallery, Inc. /Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Togut, Albert) (Filing Fee $350.00 Charged to the Estate, Receipt #635) Modified on 11/8/2019 (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Schedule of Transfers |