Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His C v. Nannestad Robinson Ltd. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-13228
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-13228
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01394 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 07, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Nannestad Robinson Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christine Barberi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Monday, April 13, 2020 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 04/13 5:34 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1394 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
||
Friday, April 10, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Certificate of Mailing PDF notice
Sat 04/11 12:23 AM
Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 04/10/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
misc
PDF Notice
Wed 04/08 3:12 PM
Notice of Default Judgment (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Judgment
Wed 04/08 3:10 PM
Judgment signed on 4/3/2020. Judgement entered against each of the Defendants in the principal sum of $721,000, plus court filing fees in the amount of $350 with interest. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 20,0007 (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
Sunday, April 05, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Certificate of Mailing PDF notice
Mon 04/06 12:16 AM
Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 04/05/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 03, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
misc
PDF Notice
Fri 04/03 3:39 PM
Notice of Judgment (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
25 | 25
order
Judgment
Fri 04/03 3:35 PM
Judgment signed on 4/3/2020. Judgement entered against each of the Defendants in the principal sum of $721,000, plus court filing fees in the amount of $350 with interest. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 20,0007 (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
24 | 24
order
Motion, Default Judgment
Fri 04/03 11:07 AM
Order signed on 3/31/2020 Granting Motion for Default Judgment . (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
Monday, March 30, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
Mon 03/30 9:39 AM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 /(Hearing Date: March 31, 2020 at 10 a.m.) Certificate of No Objection to Trustee's Application for Entry of an Order Granting Default Judgment Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice, Hearing
Thu 03/26 12:54 PM
Notice of Hearing /(Hearing Date: 3/31/2020 at 10 a.m.) Notice of Telephonic Hearing filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2020 (check with court for location)(Berger, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: General Order M-543 | ||
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 02/25 5:11 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Hearing to Consider Proposed Order Approving Trustee's Application for Entry of an Order Granting Default Judgment Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Motion, Default Judgment
Tue 02/25 11:02 AM
Motion for Default Judgment /(Hearing Date: 3/31/2020 @ 10:00 A.M., Objection Deadline: 3/24/2020 @ 4:00 P.M.) Trustee's Application for Entry of an Order Granting Default Judgment filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) Responses due by 3/24/2020, (Berger, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Docket Report | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Clerk's Entry of Default | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3: Proposed Order | ||
Att: 4 Pleading Notice of Hearing | ||
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 02/21 3:38 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference (Berger, Neil) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 02/21 10:02 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: 3/31/2020 @ 10:00 A.M.) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, January 28, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 01/28 1:20 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Proposed Order Approving Trustee's Application for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Monday, January 27, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Motion, Default Judgment
Mon 01/27 12:57 PM
Motion for Default Judgment /(Presentment Date: 2/13/2020 at 12 P.M.) Trustee's Application for Entry of an Order Granting Default Judgment filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 2/13/2020 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 501 (RG) Responses due by 2/13/2020, (Berger, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Docket | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Clerk's Entry of Default | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3: Proposed Order Granting Default Judgment | ||
Att: 4 Notice of Presentment of Proposed Order Approving Trustee's Application for Entry of Default Judgment | ||
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 01/17 1:37 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 01/16 12:15 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: 2/19/2020 at 10 A.M.) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 2/19/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Saturday, January 11, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default
Sun 01/12 12:17 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default . Notice Date 01/11/2020. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default
Sun 01/12 12:17 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default . Notice Date 01/11/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, January 09, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 01/09 2:55 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against CHRISTINE BARBERI (McCaffrey, Dawn) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 01/09 2:54 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against NANNESTAD ROBINSON LTD. (McCaffrey, Dawn) |
|
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 01/06 11:56 AM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 01/02 6:26 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: To Be Determined) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Wednesday, December 25, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 12/26 12:30 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 12/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 12/23 10:36 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil to Judge Robert E. Grossman. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Affidavit
Fri 12/20 4:56 PM
Affidavit of Neil Berger in Support of Request for a Certificate of Default Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd..(Berger, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 19 pgs Exhibit 1: Summons, Complaint and Affidavit of Service | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Docket | ||
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 11/22 12:40 PM
Affidavit of Service of (I) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding; and (II) Complaint Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 11/15 3:48 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-01394 mkv] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 635. Fee amount 350.00. (Ortiz) |
||
Monday, November 11, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 11/11 2:03 PM
Affidavit of Service of (I) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding; and (II) Complaint (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, November 08, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 11/08 1:17 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MKV), Answer due by 12/9/2019, (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Thu 11/07 4:31 PM
Adversary case 19-01394 Complaint against Nannestad Robinson Ltd., Christine Barberi /Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Albert Togut, Not Individually but Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Chowaiki & Co. Fine Art Ltd.. (Togut, Albert) (Filing Fee $350.00 Charged to the Estate, Receipt #635) Modified on 11/8/2019 (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Schedule of Two Year Transfers | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Schedule of Six Year Transfers |