Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-12269

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:19-bk-12385
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2019
Terminated:Mar 29, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
MDC Energy LLC
280 E 96th St Ste 210
Indianapolis, IN 46240-3853
Represented By
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Thursday, March 31, 2022
26 26 claims Claims Register Thu 03/31 8:51 PM
Final Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 03/29 1:02 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (JS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
25 25 order Final Decree Mon 03/28 4:16 PM
Order (I) Entering a Final Decree Closing the Bankruptcy Cases; (II) Authorizing the Abandonment of Remaining Books and Records and Other Property; and (III) Granting Related Relief. Signed on 3/28/2022 (NAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
24 24 claims Claims Register Fri 01/07 5:27 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
23 23 claims Claims Register Wed 10/06 3:31 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
22 22 claims Claims Register Tue 07/20 2:09 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
21 21 claims Claims Register Mon 04/26 7:44 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
20 20 court Case Reassigned Mon 04/26 4:36 PM
Order Reassigning Case. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
19 19 misc Letter (Bk) Thu 03/11 3:41 PM
Letter Filed by Russell K. Hunt . (DMC)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2020
18 18 claims Claims Register Fri 07/31 11:19 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2020
17 17 notice Appearance - Notice Fri 06/05 4:29 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Tarpon Pipe & Supply LP. (Tobia, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, April 20, 2020
16 16 claims Claims Register Mon 04/20 9:39 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
15 15 notice Appearance - Notice Tue 03/03 3:26 PM
Notice of Appearance.. Filed by Mt. Snow Construction LLC a/k/a Nimble Crane. (Hordern, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
14 14 20 pgs misc Schedules/Statements Wed 01/15 10:28 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by MDC Energy LLC. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
13 13 56 pgs misc Schedules/Statements Wed 01/15 10:27 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by MDC Energy LLC. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2019
12 12 court Case Reassigned Mon 12/16 10:30 AM
Order of Reassignment. Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case. Involvement of Judge Karen B. Owens Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2019
11 11 notice Lien - Notice Tue 11/26 5:16 PM
Notice of Lien Notice of Perfection of Statutory Lien by Waterbridge Texas Midstream LLC Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 546(b)(2) Filed by WaterBridge Texas Midstream LLC. (Higgins, John)
Related: [-]
10 10 crditcrd none Tue 11/26 11:48 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-12385 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9540589, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2019
9 9 5 pgs order Order-Joint Admin Fri 11/15 3:02 PM
Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of MTE Holdings LLC, Case No. 19-12269 (KBO) for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in the chapter 11 case of MTE Holdings LLC, Case No. 19-12269 (KBO), should be consulted for all matters concerning this case. Signed on 11/15/2019 (Mml)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Appearance - Notice Fri 11/15 2:50 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by United Casing, Inc.. (Dushkin, Jay)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs notice Appearance - Notice Fri 11/15 11:29 AM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Synergy Cleaning Solutions, LLC. (Kelly, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance - Notice Fri 11/15 11:23 AM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Stealth Pump & Supply, Inc.. (Kelly, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance - Notice Fri 11/15 11:13 AM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Stealth Pump & Supply, Inc.. (Kelly, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appearance - Notice Fri 11/15 11:07 AM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Patriot Premium Threading, LLC. (Kelly, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2019
3 3 53 pgs misc List of Creditors Wed 11/13 10:42 PM
List of Creditors (Notice of Filing) Filed by MDC Energy LLC. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
2 2 notice Appearance - Notice Tue 11/12 12:00 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by WaterBridge Texas Midstream LLC. (Higgins, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2019
1 1 13 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 11/08 3:09 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by MDC Energy LLC. (Dehney, Robert)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Fri 11/08 3:56 PM
Judge Karen B. Owens added to case (BA)
Related: [-]