Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-12269

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:19-bk-12387
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2019
Terminated:Mar 29, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
MDC Texas Operator LLC
280 E 96th St Ste 210
Indianapolis, IN 46240-3853
Represented By
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Thursday, March 31, 2022
16 16 claims Claims Register Thu 03/31 8:53 PM
Final Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 03/29 1:03 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (JS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
15 15 order Final Decree Mon 03/28 4:16 PM
Order (I) Entering a Final Decree Closing the Bankruptcy Cases; (II) Authorizing the Abandonment of Remaining Books and Records and Other Property; and (III) Granting Related Relief. Signed on 3/28/2022 (NAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
14 14 claims Claims Register Fri 01/07 5:29 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
13 13 claims Claims Register Wed 10/06 3:32 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
12 12 claims Claims Register Tue 07/20 2:13 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
11 11 claims Claims Register Mon 04/26 7:45 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
10 10 court Case Reassigned Mon 04/26 4:36 PM
Order Reassigning Case. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2020
9 9 claims Claims Register Fri 07/31 11:21 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 20, 2020
8 8 claims Claims Register Mon 04/20 9:40 PM
Quarterly Claims Register . Filed by Stretto. (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
7 7 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 01/15 10:36 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by MDC Texas Operator LLC. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 01/15 10:35 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by MDC Texas Operator LLC. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2019
5 5 court Case Reassigned Mon 12/16 10:30 AM
Order of Reassignment. Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case. Involvement of Judge Karen B. Owens Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2019
4 4 crditcrd none Tue 11/26 11:48 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-12387 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9540589, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2019
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Fri 11/15 3:02 PM
Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of MTE Holdings LLC, Case No. 19-12269 (KBO) for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in the chapter 11 case of MTE Holdings LLC, Case No. 19-12269 (KBO), should be consulted for all matters concerning this case. Signed on 11/15/2019 (Mml)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2019
2 2 53 pgs misc List of Creditors Wed 11/13 10:44 PM
List of Creditors (Notice of Filing) Filed by MDC Texas Operator LLC. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2019
1 1 13 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 11/08 3:15 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by MDC Texas Operator LLC. (Dehney, Robert)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Fri 11/08 3:56 PM
Judge Karen B. Owens added to case (BA)
Related: [-]