Sommers v. Nigerian Agip Exploration Limited
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-32106
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-32106
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03667 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 11, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Nigerian Agip Exploration Limited, defendant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald J. Sommers, Chapter 7 trustee/plaintiff
2800 Post Oak Blvd. 61st Floor
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Wednesday, June 01, 2022 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Wed 06/01 8:08 AM
Judge Marvin Isgur added to case. Involvement of Judge Andrew Hanen Terminated, assignment made in error. (RobbieWestmoreland) |
||
Tuesday, May 31, 2022 | ||
court
Case Assigned
Tue 05/31 11:29 AM
Civil Action 4 22-1746 Re: Motion to Withdraw Reference: Judge Andrew Hanen added to case (SierraThomasAnderson) |
||
Saturday, May 28, 2022 | ||
68 | 68
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 05/28 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/28/2022. (Admin.) |
|
67 | 67
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 05/28 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/28/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2022 | ||
66 | 66
order
Generic Order
Thu 05/26 2:14 PM
Order on First Amended Complaint, Signed on 5/26/2022 (TylerLaws) |
|
65 | 65
order
Report and Recommendation
Thu 05/26 2:12 PM
Report and Recommendation, Signed on 5/26/2022 (TylerLaws) |